Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. Broan-Nutone, LLC
Plaintiff: Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Broan-Nutone, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02587
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 09:0205
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #12 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/8/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
November 7, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Broan-Nutone, LLC All parties consent.. (Hall, Robert)
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William Bryant Bodie on behalf of Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney William Bryant Bodie added to party Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company(pty:pla) (Bodie, William)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Broan-Nutone, LLC.(Hall, Robert)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert James Zavaglia, Jr on behalf of Broan-Nutone, LLCAttorney Robert James Zavaglia, Jr added to party Broan-Nutone, LLC(pty:dft) (Zavaglia, Robert)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #7 Order to Ryan M. Swedlaw and Rusty D. Miller at Redman & Associates, 10002 Park Meadows Dr, Suite 100, Lone Tree, CO 80124. Text Only Entry (tsher, )
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 9/12/2019. Consent Form due by 11/7/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cmadr, ) Modified to correct docket entry on 9/18/2019 (cmadr, ).
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Civil COMPLAINT against Broan-Nutone, LLC, filed by Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(cmadr, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Nortek, Inc. for Broan-Nutone, LLC. (Hall, Robert)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Broan-Nutone, LLC from District Court, Adams County, Colorado, Case Number 2019-cv-31282. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6889595), filed by Broan-Nutone, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Civil Case Coversheet, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 - Summons, #4 Exhibit Ex 4 - Def's Corporate Disclosure Statement, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Hall, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. Broan-Nutone, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broan-Nutone, LLC
Represented By: Robert Buckner Hall, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?