Left Coast Cellars, LLC v. Left Coast Brewing Co.
Plaintiff: Left Coast Cellars, LLC
Defendant: Left Coast Brewing Co.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02597
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California by Defendant Left Coast Brewing Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of James M. Hester, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Tommy Hadjis, #3 Continuation of Main Document Memorandum of Law in Support)(Hester, James)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Left Coast Cellars, LLC. Left Coast Brewing Co. served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Nardiello, Jason)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/26/19 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/26/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 12/2/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cmadr, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #2 Complaint filed by attorneyJason Nardiello.Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number COX091985 (cmadr, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 Administrative Notice: No filing fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet against Left Coast Brewing Co., filed by Left Coast Cellars, LLC.(Nardiello, Jason) Modified to correct document title on 9/16/2019 (cmadr, ).
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Left Coast Brewing Co. by Plaintiff Left Coast Cellars, LLC. (Nardiello, Jason)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Left Coast Brewing Co. (Filing fee $ 400).Attorney Jason Nardiello added to party Left Coast Cellars, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Left Coast Cellars, LLC.(Nardiello, Jason)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 Administrative Notice: No initiating document. Attorney contacted with instructions to file the initiating document within 24 hours. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Left Coast Cellars, LLC v. Left Coast Brewing Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Left Coast Brewing Co.
Represented By: James M. Hester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Left Coast Cellars, LLC
Represented By: Jason Nardiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?