Morrison v. Aramark Campus LLC et al
Plaintiff: David Morrison
Defendant: John Loukas, Craig Luckmann, Aramark Campus LLC and Jennifer Moloney
Case Number: 1:2019cv02620
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
2 Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint [DKT. 1] by Defendants Aramark Campus LLC, John Loukas, Craig Luckmann, Jennifer Moloney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint)(Hadacek, Joseph)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/22/19 Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/28/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 12/5/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Jennifer Moloney served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019. (athom, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Craig Luckmann served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019. (athom, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #1 Employment Discrimination Complaint for Service of Process. (Attachments: #1 Forms USM-285) (rvill, )
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/18/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DRAWING CASE by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/17/2019. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02620-DDD . (sphil, )
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without PrepayingFees or Costs (Long Form), by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/16/2019.(sphil, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Plaintiff David Morrison. (rvill, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION COMPLAINT against Aramark Campus LLC, John Loukas, Craig Luckmann, Jennifer Moloney, filed by David Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rvill, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrison v. Aramark Campus LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Loukas
Represented By: Joseph D. Hadacek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Luckmann
Represented By: Joseph D. Hadacek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Campus LLC
Represented By: Joseph D. Hadacek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Moloney
Represented By: Joseph D. Hadacek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?