USA v. $3,581.00 in United States Currency et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $53,240.00 in United States Currency and $3,581.00 in United States Currency
Case Number: 1:2019cv02630
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Publication by Plaintiff USA (Attachments: #1 Publication)(Hurd, Laura)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT of Claim by Defendants $3,581.00 in United States Currency, $53,240.00 in United States Currency. (Cox, Ryan)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT of Claim by Defendants $3,581.00 in United States Currency, $53,240.00 in United States Currency. (Cox, Ryan)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 WARRANT For Arrest of Property In Rem issued. (nmarb, )
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property IN REM, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/19/19. (nmarb, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Hurd, Laura)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cmadr, ) Modified to correct document on 9/19/2019 (cmadr, ).
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $3,581.00 in United States Currency, $53,240.00 in United States Currency Attorney Laura Beth Hurd added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Warrant for Arrest of Property, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hurd, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $3,581.00 in United States Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $53,240.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $3,581.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Laura Beth Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?