Jorgensen et al v. American Medical Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Anna Maria Jorgensen and Aron Jorgensen
Defendant: American Medical Systems, Inc. and American Medical Systems
Case Number: 1:2019cv02672
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/25/19 GRANTING #8 Plaintiff's Motion to Reschedule Scheduling Conference. Consent Form due by 1/3/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 1/10/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/19 at 10:30 AM is VACATED and RESET to 1/17/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix.(nmarb, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Plaintiffs Anna Maria Jorgensen, Aron Jorgensen. (Levy, Jason)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, ) (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/24/2019) (nmarb, ).
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/20/19 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/19/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 11/19/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#3] is November 5, 2019. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/20/2019. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to American Medical Systems by Plaintiffs Anna Maria Jorgensen, Aron Jorgensen. (Levy, Jason)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (cmadr, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against American Medical Systems, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6901987)Attorney Jason David Levy added to party Anna Maria Jorgensen(pty:pla), Attorney Jason David Levy added to party Aron Jorgensen(pty:pla), filed by Anna Maria Jorgensen, Aron Jorgensen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Levy, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jorgensen et al v. American Medical Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Maria Jorgensen
Represented By: Jason David Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aron Jorgensen
Represented By: Jason David Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?