Schmitz v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sandra Schmitz
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv02699
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding.By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/12/19. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
November 7, 2019 Filing 16 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #14 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02699-REB. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/7/19 re: #14 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. At least one party in this civil action does not consent to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). (nmarb, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Bell, Devon)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/15/19 GRANTING #12 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 12/30/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/19 at 9:30AM is VACATED and RESET for 1/6/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix.(nmarb, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Scheduling/Planning Conference by Plaintiff Sandra Schmitz. (LaCrue, DezaRae)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/2/19 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/14/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 11/21/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#8] is November 7, 2019. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/2/2019. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(Bell, Devon)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cmadr, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company on 30 August, 2019 (cmadr, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Sandra Schmitz.(cmadr, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by DezaRae D. LaCrue on behalf of Sandra SchmitzAttorney DezaRae D. LaCrue added to party Sandra Schmitz(pty:pla) (LaCrue, DezaRae)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rebecca Kirsten Wagner on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Rebecca Kirsten Wagner added to party Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Wagner, Rebecca)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2019CV31948. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6905641), filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-State Court Summons, #4 Exhibit A-State Court Delay Reduction Order, #5 Exhibit A-State Court Affidavit of Service, #6 Exhibit B-Voter Registration, #7 Exhibit C-Accident Report, #8 Exhibit D-Allstate Corporation File Detail Report, #9 State Court Register of Actions, #10 Disclosure Statement, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Bell, Devon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmitz v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Schmitz
Represented By: DezaRae D. LaCrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Rebecca Kirsten Wagner
Represented By: Devon D. A. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?