Byk v. LM General Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kristi Byk
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and LM General Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv02710
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Kristi Byk.(LaCrue, DezaRae)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER granting #24 Motion to Amend the Caption. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint no later than Monday, November 18, 2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/14/19. Text Only Entry(kmtlc2)
November 14, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/14/19 regarding #24 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify The Caption filed by Kristi Byk. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
November 13, 2019 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify The Caption by Plaintiff Kristi Byk. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(LaCrue, DezaRae)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/13/2019. (ksena)
November 13, 2019 Filing 22 COURTROOM MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Scheduling Conference held on 11/13/2019, ( Discovery due by 5/11/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 6/10/2020.). FTR: courtroom 101. (ksena)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER striking #17 Stipulation for Substitution of Defendant and Amendment of Case Caption for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 6.1(a) and 15.1. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/04/19. Text Only Entry (kmtlc2)
November 1, 2019 Filing 20 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Strandjord, Jay)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER granting #16 Joint Motion to Appear at Scheduling Conference by Telephone. The parties shall initiate a conference call and contact chambers, 719-575-0328, at the scheduled time. The parties shall use a LAND LINE; NO CELLULAR, CORDLESS OR SPEAKER PHONES ARE PERMITTED. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/31/19. Text Only Entry(kmtlc2)
October 31, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/31/19 regarding #16 Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone at Scheduling Conference filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 STRICKEN STIPULATION for Substitution of Defendant and Amendment of Case Caption by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Strandjord, Jay) Modified on 11/4/2019 to strike pursuant Minute Order #21 (jgonz, ).
October 31, 2019 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone at Scheduling Conference by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Strandjord, Jay)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/28/19. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #13 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02710-REB. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Strandjord, Jay)
October 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jay Robert Strandjord on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Jay Robert Strandjord added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Strandjord, Jay)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tonya L. Melnichenko on behalf of Kristi BykAttorney Tonya L. Melnichenko added to party Kristi Byk(pty:pla) (Melnichenko, Tonya)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by DezaRae D. LaCrue on behalf of Kristi BykAttorney DezaRae D. LaCrue added to party Kristi Byk(pty:pla) (LaCrue, DezaRae)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 11/13/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 11/6/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 09/26/2019. (ksena)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Spano, Brian)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rsams, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Liberty Mutual Insurance Company on August 30, 2019. (rsams, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Kristi Byk.(rsams, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (rsams, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Records by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Filing State Court Records)(Spano, Brian)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company from District Court for El Paso County, Case Number 2019cv31911. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6906450), filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint (State Court), #2 Exhibit B - Return of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Summons, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet to Notice of Removal)(Spano, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byk v. LM General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristi Byk
Represented By: DezaRae D. LaCrue
Represented By: Tonya L. Melnichenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian John Spano
Represented By: Jay Robert Strandjord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?