Smith Family Trust, The v. Ohio Security Insurance Company
Plaintiff: The Smith Family Trust and Smith Family Trust, The
Defendant: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv02718
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/9/2020 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 12/26/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/2/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/29/2019. (jgonz, )
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER The Court finds #9 Response to Order to Show Cause sufficient at this stage of the proceedings to satisfy the Court of its subject matter jurisdiction over this lawsuit. Accordingly, #7 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/29/2019. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 DISCHARGED RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #7 by Plaintiff Smith Family Trust, The. (Archuleta, Nathanael) Modified on 10/29/2019 pursuant to order #8(jgonz, ).
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian John Spano on behalf of Ohio Security Insurance Company (Spano, Brian)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: returnable by Plaintiff why this case should not be dismissed due to the Courts lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 11/1/2019. by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/18/2019. (jgonz, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Angela Marie Vichick on behalf of Ohio Security Insurance CompanyAttorney Angela Marie Vichick added to party Ohio Security Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Vichick, Angela)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Brian John Spano added to party Ohio Security Insurance Company(pty:dft) by Ohio Security Insurance Company.(Spano, Brian)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Smith Family Trust, The. Ohio Security Insurance Company served on 9/25/2019, answer due 10/16/2019. (Archuleta, Nathanael)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ohio Security Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6908367)Attorney Nathanael Thomas Archuleta added to party The Smith Family Trust(pty:pla), filed by The Smith Family Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Archuleta, Nathanael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith Family Trust, The v. Ohio Security Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian John Spano
Represented By: Angela Marie Vichick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Smith Family Trust
Represented By: Nathanael Thomas Archuleta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smith Family Trust, The
Represented By: Nathanael Thomas Archuleta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?