Quiller v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Jimmie Quiller
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2019cv02762
Filed: September 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER: By request of the parties, the Status Conference is RESET for 1/22/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 11/13/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/12/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc2)
October 31, 2019 Filing 19 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #17 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02762-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Melanie Rachael Sulkin on behalf of Jimmie QuillerAttorney Melanie Rachael Sulkin added to party Jimmie Quiller(pty:pla) (Sulkin, Melanie)
October 30, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Jimmie Quiller All parties do not consent.. (Elliott, John)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: A Status Conference is set for 11/21/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. On or before 11/14/2019 the parties shall file the Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/30/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
October 2, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Christopher Elliott on behalf of Jimmie QuillerAttorney John Christopher Elliott added to party Jimmie Quiller(pty:pla) (Elliott, John)
October 1, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Mark Thomas Clouatre on behalf of All Defendants (Clouatre, Mark)
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance on Behalf of C.R. Bard, Inc and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. by Matthew Brian Lerner on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Matthew Brian Lerner added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Brian Lerner added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft) (Lerner, Matthew)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance on Behalf of C.R. Bard, Inc and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. by Blake Adam Gansborg on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Blake Adam Gansborg added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Blake Adam Gansborg added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft) (Gansborg, Blake)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance on Behalf of C.R. Bard, Inc and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. by Richard B. North, Jr on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Richard B. North, Jr added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Richard B. North, Jr added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft) (North, Richard)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance on Behalf of C.R. Bard, Inc and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. by Christopher Shaun Polston on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Christopher Shaun Polston added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Shaun Polston added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft) (Polston, Christopher)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance on Behalf of C.R. Bard, Inc and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. by Mark Thomas Clouatre on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Mark Thomas Clouatre added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Thomas Clouatre added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft) (Clouatre, Mark)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rsams, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (rsams, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-03761. File, transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 6, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to District of Colorado via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/26/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re #3 . Signed By Judge David G. Campbell on 8/26/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/26/2019.] (rsams, ).
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Document for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/26/2019.] (rsams, ).
October 31, 2016 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-3761-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/26/2019.]
October 31, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13558720 filed by Jimmie Quiller. (Attachments: ( #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (rsams, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quiller v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Christopher Shaun Polston
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Blake A. Gansborg
Represented By: Mark Thomas Clouatre
Represented By: Matthew Brian Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Christopher Shaun Polston
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Blake A. Gansborg
Represented By: Mark Thomas Clouatre
Represented By: Matthew Brian Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Quiller
Represented By: John Christopher Elliott
Represented By: Melanie Rachael Sulkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?