Sangbana v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Oubote Wassan SANGBANA
Defendant: KRISTI BARROWS, Act DHS Sec. Kevin MCALEENAN, Acting Director Kenneth CUCCINELLI, William P. BARR, Field Office Dir. ANDREW LAMBRECHT, Ken Cuccinell, Andrew Lambrecht and Kevin McAleenan
Case Number: 1:2019cv02794
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Reset by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/22/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Accordingly, the proposed scheduling order is due 12/10/2019. Text Only Entry(nywlc1, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM regarding #7 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference filed by Ken Cuccinell, Kevin McAleenan, Kristi Barrows, Andrew Lambrecht, William P. Barr. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/22/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc2)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference by Defendants William P. Barr, Kristi Barrows, Ken Cuccinell, Andrew Lambrecht, Kevin McAleenan. (Ross, Katherine)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon U.S. Attorney defendant(s) William P. Barr served on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019; Kristi Barrows served on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019; Ken Cuccinell served on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019; Andrew Lambrecht served on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019; Kevin McAleenan served on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Card (Barr), #2 Exhibit Certified Mail Card (McAlleenan), #3 Exhibit Certified Mail Card (Cuccinelli), #4 Exhibit Certified Mail Card (Barrows), #5 Exhibit Certified Mail Card (Lambrecht))(Gianelli, Michael)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/22/19 Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/25/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 12/2/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/2/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc2)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William P. BARR, KRISTI BARROWS, Kenneth CUCCINELLI, ANDREW LAMBRECHT, Kevin MCALEENAN (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6920755)Attorney Michael Paul Gianelli added to party Oubote Wassan SANGBANA(pty:pla), filed by Oubote Wassan SANGBANA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (LPR Card), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (Notice of Examination), #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (Electronic Status Inquiry), #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 (Lttr to FOD CIS), #5 Summons Summons (Barr), #6 Summons Summons (McAleenan), #7 Summons Summons (Cuccinelli), #8 Summons Summons (Barrows), #9 Summons Summons (Lambrecht), #10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Gianelli, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sangbana v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRISTI BARROWS
Represented By: Katherine Ann Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Act DHS Sec. Kevin MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. BARR
Represented By: Katherine Ann Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Dir. ANDREW LAMBRECHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cuccinell
Represented By: Katherine Ann Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Lambrecht
Represented By: Katherine Ann Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Katherine Ann Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oubote Wassan SANGBANA
Represented By: Michael Paul Gianelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?