Brooks v. Pikes Peak Hospice and Palliative Care, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gloria Brooks
Defendant: Pikes Peak Hospice and Palliative Care, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02827
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: FMLA
Cause of Action: 29:2611
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint by Pikes Peak Hospice and Palliative Care, Inc..(Vickles, Heather)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED ORDER SETTING Scheduling Conference for 12/11/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 12/4/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/22/2019. (ksena)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER granting #25 Motion to Reset Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference set for December 2, 2019 is vacated, to be reset by separate order. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/22/19. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
November 22, 2019 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference by Defendant Pikes Peak Hospice and Palliative Care, Inc.. (Vickles, Heather)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SECOND ORDER SETTING Scheduling Conference for 12/2/2019 10:45 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 11/25/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/18/2019. (ksena)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER granting #21 Motion to Reset Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference will be reset by separate order. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/18/19. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
November 15, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM regarding #21 Unopposed MOTION to Reset the Scheduling Conference filed by Gloria Brooks. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/15/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
November 15, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Reset the Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Gloria Brooks. (Dell'Olio, Donna)
November 14, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Pikes Peak Hospice and Palliative Care, Inc., filed by Gloria Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Dell'Olio, Donna)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. On or before Friday, November 15, 2019, Plaintiff shall file a copy of the Amended Complaint (including exhibits) without the redlining and strike through. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/13/2019. (Text Only Entry)(rmsec )
November 13, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Gloria Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1 to Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 to Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2)(Dell'Olio, Donna)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER granting #15 Motion to Vacate and Reschedule Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference set for December 2, 2019, is vacated. Plaintiff shall file a Status Report on or before March 12, 20202, advising of the status of the EEOC action and whether a Notice of Right to Sue has been issued. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/12/19. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM regarding #15 Joint MOTION to Vacate #4 Order AND RESCHEDULE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND STIPULATION CONCERNING EXHAUSTION OF ADMINISTRATIVE REMEDIES DEFENSE filed by Gloria Brooks. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/12/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
November 12, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Vacate #4 Order AND RESCHEDULE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND STIPULATION CONCERNING EXHAUSTION OF ADMINISTRATIVE REMEDIES DEFENSE by Plaintiff Gloria Brooks. (Dell'Olio, Donna)
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #7 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Raymond Myles Deeny. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/4/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/4/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02827-RM. (athom, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 10 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #9 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02827-REB. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Pikes Peak Hospice and Palliative Care, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Vickles, Heather)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Comfort Bridge d/b/a Care Synergy for Pikes Peak Hospice and Palliative Care, Inc.. (Vickles, Heather)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Raymond Myles Deeny on behalf of Pikes Peak Hospice and Palliative Care, Inc.Attorney Raymond Myles Deeny added to party Pikes Peak Hospice and Palliative Care, Inc.(pty:dft) (Deeny, Raymond)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Heather Fox Vickles added to party Pikes Peak Hospice and Palliative Care, Inc.(pty:dft) by Pikes Peak Hospice and Palliative Care, Inc..(Vickles, Heather)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gloria Brooks. Pikes Peak Hospice and Palliative Care, Inc. served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (Dell'Olio, Donna)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 12/2/2019 10:45 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 11/25/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/07/2019. (ksena)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rsams, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pikes Peak Hospice and Palliative Care Inc (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6927843)Attorney Donna E. Dell'Olio added to party Gloria Brooks(pty:pla), filed by Gloria Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dell'Olio, Donna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Pikes Peak Hospice and Palliative Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pikes Peak Hospice and Palliative Care, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Fox Vickles
Represented By: Raymond Myles Deeny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Brooks
Represented By: Donna E. Dell'Olio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?