Halter v. Weld County Sheriff's Office et al
Plaintiff: ETHEL SUSANNE HALTER
Defendant: ROES 1 - X INFINATE, Weld County Sheriff's Office and DOES 1 - X INFINATE
Case Number: 1:2019cv02871
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause and Appointing Pro Bono Counsel by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 12/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope A) (jgonz, )
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Setting Status Conference. IT IS ORDERED that a Status Conference is set for 12/19/2019 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews in Courtroom C201 of the the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse. Because this will be Plaintiff's first appearance before the Court, she is FURTHER ORDERED to appear in person at the conference. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 12/5/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #9 Motion for Costs. The Motion is Plaintiff's "Application to Proceed in District Court with Prepaying Fees or Costs." [See #9 .] This application, if granted, would give Plaintiff in forma pauperis status. Proceeding in forma pauperis waives the $400 filing fee associated with filing a case in this Court, the Federal District Court for the District of Colorado. Typically, Plaintiff's are responsible for paying the filing fee. However, Defendants removed this case from where it was originally filed by Plaintiff, Weld County District Court for the State of Colorado to this Court. Therefore, Defendants are responsible for paying the filing fee -- not Plaintiff. Thus, the relief sought by the Motion would have no effect on these proceeding, rendering the Motion moot. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the Motion is DENIED AS MOOT. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 12/4/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
December 4, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(B)(6) filed by Defendant Weld County Sheriff's Office. (Pratt, Katherine)
December 3, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendant Weld County Sheriff's Office. (Pratt, Katherine)
November 27, 2019 Filing 25 First MOTION to Dismiss Defense's Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Ethel Susanne Halter. (Halter, Ethel)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DISCHARGED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 11/18/19, returnable by Plaintiff Ethel Susanne Halter as to why this case should not be dismissed with prejudice for failure prosecute pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and why the Court should not order sanctions against Halter in the form of attorneys fees incurred by Defendants' for the preparation and participation at the Status Conference. Show Cause Response due by 12/2/2019. (nmarb, ) Modified on 12/5/2019 (jgonz, ).
November 18, 2019 Filing 23 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews: Status Conference held on 11/18/2019. The Court will issue an order to show cause as to Ms. Halter's nonappearance. Finding as moot #16 Motion to Dismiss. #17 Motion to Stay is granted to the extent is seeks to stay discovery. Discovery is STAYED pending further order of the court. Response to #19 Motion to dismiss is due on or before 11/29/2019. FTR: Courtroom C-201. (amont, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Cathy Havener Greer on behalf of Weld County Sheriff's OfficeAttorney Cathy Havener Greer added to party Weld County Sheriff's Office(pty:dft) (Greer, Cathy)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Converting Scheduling Conference to a Status Conference. IT IS ORDERED that the 11/18/2019 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference is CONVERTED to a Status Conference set for 11/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties should be prepared to discuss the #17 Motion to Stay, the pending Motions to Dismiss, and Plaintiff's #18 Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 11/15/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
November 12, 2019 Filing 20 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Weld County Sheriff's Office. (Pratt, Katherine)
November 7, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(B)(6) by Defendant Weld County Sheriff's Office. (Pratt, Katherine)
October 29, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Weld County, Colorado, Weld County Sheriffs Office, Does 1-X Infinite, and Roes 1-X Infinite, filed by Ethel Susanne Halter.(Halter, Ethel) Modified on 11/4/2019 to correct event type and docket text (jgonz, ).
October 29, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Vacate Scheduling Conference by Defendant Weld County Sheriff's Office. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Pratt, Katherine)
October 29, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(B)(6) by Defendant Weld County Sheriff's Office. (Pratt, Katherine)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CIVIL PRACTICE AND TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Issued by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/25/2019. (skclc2)
October 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Issued by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/25/2019. (skclc2)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is set for 11/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 11/12/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/25/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED ANSWER to , ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment , TRAVERSE by Plaintiff Ethel Susanne Halter. (Halter, Ethel)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #10 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/23/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Weld County Sheriff's Office All parties consent.. (Pratt, Katherine)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Costs by Plaintiff Ethel Susanne Halter. (Halter, Ethel)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. For good cause shown, the Motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Weld County Sheriff's Office's answer is due 10/29/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/11/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendant Weld County Sheriff's Office. (Pratt, Katherine)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cmadr, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Weld County Sheriff's Office, filed by Ethel Susanne Halter.(cmadr, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Weld County Sheriff's Office, filed by Ethel Susanne Halter.(cmadr, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Weld County Sheriff's Office from District Court For Weld County, Colorado, Case Number 2019CV44. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6934626), filed by Weld County Sheriff's Office. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Donald Patch, #4 Exhibit D - 9.6.19 District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit E - 9.17.19 District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit F - Finding And Order Concerning Payment of Filing Fees, #7 Exhibit G - Register of Actions District Court Weld County, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Pratt, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halter v. Weld County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ETHEL SUSANNE HALTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROES 1 - X INFINATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weld County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Katherine M.L. Pratt
Represented By: Cathy Havener Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 - X INFINATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?