Rounds et al v. FourPoint Energy, LLC
Plaintiff: Randy Carl Smith and Kenny Wayne Rounds
Defendant: FourPoint Energy, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02878
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1453
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 29 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant FourPoint Energy, LLC. (Stahl, Craig)
December 5, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Transfer Case by Defendant FourPoint Energy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Nessinger Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B-Pls First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C-Previous Complaints WD OK, #4 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Mtn to Transfer)(Stahl, Craig)
November 8, 2019 Filing 27 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #20 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Craig L. Stahl; Jeffrey T. Kuehnle. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 11/8/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 25 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #23 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02878-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, )
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER re: #23 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Randy Carl Smith, Kenny Wayne Rounds by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/7/2019. Parties do not consent. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). (tsher, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 23 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Kenny Wayne Rounds, Randy Carl Smith All parties do not consent.. (Bradford, Reagan)
November 6, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Related Cases by Defendant FourPoint Energy, LLC (Stahl, Craig)
November 6, 2019 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent FourPoint Holdings, LLC for FourPoint Energy, LLC. (Stahl, Craig)
November 6, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Jeffrey T. Kuehnle by Craig L. Stahl on behalf of FourPoint Energy, LLC (Stahl, Craig)
November 6, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Craig L. Stahl by Craig L. Stahl on behalf of FourPoint Energy, LLC (Stahl, Craig)
November 6, 2019 Filing 18 Defendant's Original ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint of Plaintiffs Attorney Craig L. Stahl added to party FourPoint Energy, LLC(pty:dft) by FourPoint Energy, LLC.(Stahl, Craig)
October 23, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #15 Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Kenny Wayne Rounds, Randy Carl Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Redlined Complaint)(Bradford, Reagan)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/23/2019 re: #15 Amended Complaint filed by Randy Carl Smith, Kenny Wayne Rounds. Notice due by 10/31/2019. (tsher, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against FourPoint Energy, LLC, filed by Kenny Wayne Rounds, Randy Carl Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Rounds Lease, #2 Exhibit 2- Smith Lease)(Bradford, Reagan)
October 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Charles Vance Knutter on behalf of Kenny Wayne Rounds, Randy Carl SmithAttorney Charles Vance Knutter added to party Kenny Wayne Rounds(pty:pla), Attorney Charles Vance Knutter added to party Randy Carl Smith(pty:pla) (Knutter, Charles)
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Randolph Gleason on behalf of Kenny Wayne Rounds, Randy Carl SmithAttorney David Randolph Gleason added to party Kenny Wayne Rounds(pty:pla), Attorney David Randolph Gleason added to party Randy Carl Smith(pty:pla) (Gleason, David)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/9/2019. Consent Form due by 11/22/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/21/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-2878-MEH (angar, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 Amended SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ryan Keith Wilson on behalf of Kenny Wayne Rounds, Randy Carl SmithAttorney Ryan Keith Wilson added to party Kenny Wayne Rounds(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan Keith Wilson added to party Randy Carl Smith(pty:pla) (Wilson, Ryan)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Margaret Elizabeth Robertson on behalf of Kenny Wayne Rounds, Randy Carl SmithAttorney Margaret Elizabeth Robertson added to party Kenny Wayne Rounds(pty:pla), Attorney Margaret Elizabeth Robertson added to party Randy Carl Smith(pty:pla) (Robertson, Margaret)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Reagan Edward Bradford on behalf of Kenny Wayne Rounds, Randy Carl Smith (Bradford, Reagan)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to FourPoint Energy, LLC by Plaintiffs Kenny Wayne Rounds, Randy Carl Smith. (Bradford, Reagan)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) Modified on 10/9/2019 to correct file date. (alave, ).
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number COX092312 (trvo, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FourPoint Energy, LLC (Filing fee $ 400).Attorney Reagan Edward Bradford added to party Kenny Wayne Rounds(pty:pla), Attorney Reagan Edward Bradford added to party Randy Carl Smith(pty:pla), filed by Kenny Wayne Rounds, Randy Carl Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Oil and Gas Lease, #2 Exhibit 2-Oil and Gas Lease, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bradford, Reagan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rounds et al v. FourPoint Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FourPoint Energy, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Kuehnle
Represented By: Craig L. Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Carl Smith
Represented By: Reagan Edward Bradford
Represented By: David Randolph Gleason
Represented By: Margaret Elizabeth Robertson
Represented By: Ryan Keith Wilson
Represented By: Charles Vance Knutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Wayne Rounds
Represented By: Reagan Edward Bradford
Represented By: David Randolph Gleason
Represented By: Margaret Elizabeth Robertson
Represented By: Ryan Keith Wilson
Represented By: Charles Vance Knutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?