Robertson et al v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Farlan A Robertson and Laura E Robertson
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, Barrett Frappier & Weisserman, LLP, Nicole A. Williams and U.S. Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02909
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re: #27 Order of Remand to Pueblo County District Court. (rvill, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 28 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #27 Order. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. The Motion to Remand (ECF No. #22 ) is GRANTED. This case is REMANDED to the District Court, County of Pueblo, State of Colorado, where it was filed as Case No. 2019CV030586, and the Clerk shall close this case. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/02/2019. (rvill, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE to #22 MOTION to Remand Attorney Jamie Grant Siler added to party U.S. Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) filed by Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Siler, Jamie)
November 18, 2019 Filing 25 SECOND ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #23 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by attorney Nichole Rochelle Williams. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P.12(b)(6) by Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association. (Siler, Jamie)
November 13, 2019 Filing 23 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Barrett Frappier & Weisserman, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Merger)(Williams, Nichole)
November 1, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiffs Farlan A Robertson, Laura E Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Coakley, Eric)
November 1, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Barrett Frappier & Weisserman, LLP, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, Nicole A. Williams, and U.S. Bank, N.A., filed by Farlan A Robertson and Laura E Robertson. (rvill, )
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Upon consideration of the notice #15 that an amended complaint has been filed, it is ORDERED that (1) the stricken Amended Complaint #13 shall be accepted as the operative complaint, effective today; (2) the Clerk shall docket the stricken Amended Complaint #13 as a separate docket entry; and (3) the motion to dismiss #19 the original complaint is DENIED AS MOOT. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/1/2019. Text Only Entry(rmsec)
October 31, 2019 Filing 19 STATE COURT RECORDS - Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association. (Siler, Jamie) Modified to correct event on 11/1/2019 (rvill, ).
October 31, 2019 Filing 18 STATE COURT RECORDS - Response to #17 Verified Motion for Order Authorizing a Foreclosure Sale, by Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association. (Siler, Jamie) Modified to correct event on 11/1/2019 (rvill, ).
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 STATE COURT RECORDS - Verified Motion for Order Authorizing a Foreclosure Sale, by Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association. (Siler, Jamie) Modified to correct event on 11/1/2019 (rvill, ).
October 31, 2019 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT by Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association. (Siler, Jamie)
October 31, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE re #13 Amended Complaint Pursuant to 15.1(a) by Plaintiffs Farlan A Robertson, Laura E Robertson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Strikethrough Complaints)(Coakley, Eric)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: The #13 Amended Complaint is STRICKEN, for Plaintiffs' failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 15.1. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/31/19. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
October 30, 2019 Filing 13 STRICKEN AMENDED COMPLAINT against Barrett Frappier & Weisserman, LLP, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, Nicole A. Williams, filed by Farlan A Robertson, Laura E Robertson.(Coakley, Eric) Modified to Strike pursuant to 14 Minute Order on 11/1/2019 (rvill, ).
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the Court sua sponte upon review of this matter which was removed to this court on October 11, 2019. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1, "[n]o later than 14 days after the filing of the notice of removal, the removing party shall file a current docket sheet (register of actions) and shall separately file each pending motion, petition, and related response, reply, and brief." The Court's review of the record shows the register of action for each of the consolidated cases has been filed [1-1] [1-21], but that there may be motions which were filed in the state court actions which are pending and require resolution. It is therefore ORDERED that on or before Thursday, October 31, 2019, the removing parties shall either file the papers required under Local Rule 81.1 or file a status report advising that there are no matters pending. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/28/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #9 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Nichole Rochelle Williams. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 12/9/2019 10:45 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/22/2019. (ksena)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nichole Rochelle Williams on behalf of Barrett Frappier & Weisserman, LLPAttorney Nichole Rochelle Williams added to party Barrett Frappier & Weisserman, LLP(pty:dft) (Williams, Nichole)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC answer due 11/8/2019; U.S. Bank National Association answer due 11/8/2019. (Siler, Jamie)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/15/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/15/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Barrett Frappier & Weisserman, LLP, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, filed by Farlan A Robertson, Laura E Robertson.(cmadr, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association from District Court, Pueblo County, State of Colorado, Case Number 2019CV030586. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6942519), filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Civil Cover Sheet, #31 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Siler, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson et al v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farlan A Robertson
Represented By: Eric Raymond Coakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura E Robertson
Represented By: Eric Raymond Coakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Jamie Grant Siler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Jamie Grant Siler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett Frappier & Weisserman, LLP
Represented By: Nichole Rochelle Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jamie Grant Siler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?