Saleh et al v. Silco Oil Company
Plaintiff: Elham Saleh and Harry Saleh
Defendant: Silco Oil Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv02973
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 9613
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/16/2019. Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
December 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Leonard Watson on behalf of Silco Oil CompanyAttorney John Leonard Watson added to party Silco Oil Company(pty:dft) (Watson, John)
December 12, 2019 Filing 11 CASE REASSIGNED. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02973-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (slibi, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Silco Oil Company All parties do not consent.. (Hollars, Jacob)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Silco Oil Company.(Hollars, Jacob)
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Status Conference held on 12/5/2019. Consent/Non-Consent Form is extended until 12/9/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 1/28/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. FTR: Courtroom C203. (slibi, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Silco Oil Company. Silco Oil Company answer due 12/9/2019. (Hollars, Jacob)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Silco Oil Company. Silco Oil Company answer due 11/8/2019. (Hollars, Jacob)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #4 Order to Elham Saleh and Harry Saleh at 7746 Lebrun Court, Lone Tree, CO 80124. Text Only Entry (tsher, )
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 10/21/2019. Consent Form due by 11/21/2019. Status Conference set for 12/5/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. Summons issued in paper format over the counter. (cmadr, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Silco Oil Company (Filing Fee: $400.00Receipt Number:COX092431), filed by Harry Saleh, Elham Saleh.(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saleh et al v. Silco Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elham Saleh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Saleh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silco Oil Company
Represented By: Jacob Foster Hollars
Represented By: John Leonard Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?