Friedman et al v. Fazzari
Plaintiff: Richard L FRIEDMAN and Nancy Friedman
Defendant: Francesco "Frank" Fazzari
Case Number: 1:2019cv03046
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. This matter shall be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, each party to pay their own fees and costs, By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/3/2019. (angar, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Plaintiff Nancy Friedman (Hatten, Russell)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6961958)Attorney James H. Chalat added to party Richard L FRIEDMAN(pty:pla), Attorney James H. Chalat added to party Nancy Friedman(pty:pla), filed by Richard L FRIEDMAN, Nancy Friedman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Chalat, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friedman et al v. Fazzari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard L FRIEDMAN
Represented By: James H. Chalat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Friedman
Represented By: James H. Chalat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francesco "Frank" Fazzari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?