Gallan v. Bloom Business Jets, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Martin Gallan
Defendant: Rose Law, LLC, Bloom Business Jets, LLC, Brad Rose and Bloom Business Jets, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03050
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 2/13/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 2/6/2020. Consent Form due by 2/6/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 12/13/19. Text Only Entry (amont, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Rose Law, LLC served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (Vail, Jeffrey)
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Brad Rose served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (Vail, Jeffrey)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Bloom Business Jets, LLC served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (Vail, Jeffrey)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Bloom Business Jets, Inc. served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (Vail, Jeffrey)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #2 Motion to Reassign Case. The Colorado Local Rules of Procedure provide that "no party may seek special assignment, reassignment, or transfer of a related case from one judicial officer to another" pursuant to Rule 3.2. D.C.COLO.LCivR 3.2(a). Further, Local Rule 40.1(d) states that "[a] new case that is related under D.C.COLO.LCivR 3.2 to a pending case may be assigned to the same judicial officers." D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(d)(4). In support of his Motion, Plaintiff says this case is "related" to 17-cv-00186-RBJ. That case, however, is closed and thus, not pending for purposes of the Rules. The Court is not aware of any other authority that would permit the Plaintiff to so choose his judicial officer. Therefore, the Motion must be denied. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 11/1/2019. Text Only Entry(skclc1)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No summons issued. (alave, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Reassign Case to Honorable Judge Richard B. Jackson by Plaintiff Martin Gallan. (Vail, Jeffrey)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bloom Business Jets, Inc., Bloom Business Jets, LLC, Brad Rose, Rose Law, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6962124)Attorney Jeffrey Steven Vail added to party Martin Gallan(pty:pla), filed by Martin Gallan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Previous Complaint, #2 Exhibit Periodic Report BBJ, LLC, #3 Exhibit Periodic Report BBJ, Inc., #4 Exhibit Answers to Interrogatories Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 69(B), #5 Exhibit Prior Default Judgement, #6 Exhibit BBJ, Inc. Articles of Incorporation, #7 Exhibit Waiver and Service of Summons, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Vail, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallan v. Bloom Business Jets, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Gallan
Represented By: Jeffrey Steven Vail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Law, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloom Business Jets, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloom Business Jets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?