Salazar v. Arapahoe County Public Defender's Office et al
Plaintiff: James Julian Salazar
Defendant: Arapahoe County Public Defender's Office, Katie Telfer, Katie (I) Telfer, Laura Knopp and Laura (I) Knopp
Case Number: 1:2019cv03092
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 15 Request for Entry of Default as to Katie Telfer and Laura Knopp by Plaintiff James Julian Salazar. (rvill, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Enter Into Evidence by Plaintiff James Julian Salazar. (rvill, )
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER. If Mr. Salazar wants additional copies of court orders or hisown filings, he may request the same from the Clerks Office by paying $.50 per page, up front. Mr. Salazars Letter requesting additional copies (ECF No. 12) is DENIED. Mr. Salazar is advised that if he intends to file any further response to the October 31 Order, he must do so within 21 days from the date of this minute order. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/19/2019.(rvill, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Order to re-send docket numbers #4 , #5 , and #7 , by Plaintiff James Julian Salazar. (evana, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED PRISONER COMPLAINT against Katie Telfer, Laura Knopp, Katie (I) Telfer, Laura (I) Knopp, Individually and in their official capacity, filed by James Julian Salazar.(evana, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Allow Supplemental Brief by Plaintiff James Julian Salazar. (sphil, )
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER On October 31, 2019, the Court issued an Order Directing Plaintiff to Show Cause and to File an Amended Prisoner Complaint within 30 days. (ECF No. #5 ). On November 21, 2019, Mr. Salazar filed a Letter (ECF No. #7 ) in which he states that he did not receive a copy of the October 31 Order. The clerk of the court is directed to resend to Plaintiff a copy of the October 31 Order. Mr. Salazar shall show cause and file an amended Prisoner Complaint within 30 days from the date of this minute order. Failure to comply will result in dismissal of this action without further notice. The tendered amended complaint attached to Plaintiff's "Motion for Permission to Amend Complaint" (ECF No. #8 ), filed on November 25, 2019, does not comply with the October 31 Order, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/27/2019.(mailed as ordered) (evana, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to for permission to Amend #1 Complaint by Plaintiff James Julian Salazar. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Amended Complaint)(evana, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from James Salazar requesting additional copies of documents 4 and 5 (evana, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 Request to Subpoena and Enter into Evidence, by Plaintiff James Julian Salazar. (evana, )
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE AND TO FILE AN AMENDED PRISONER COMPLAINT. That Mr. Salazar show cause, in writing, within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to the doctrine of Younger abstention. That Mr. Salazar shall also file, within 30 days from the date of this Order, an Amended Prisoner Complaint, on the court-approved Prisoner Complaint form, that complies with the directives in this Order. That if Mr. Salazar fails to show cause or file an Amended Prisoner Complaint within the time allowed, this action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/31/2019. (evana, )
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the Prisoners Motion and Affidavit for Leave to ProceedPursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF No. #3 ) is GRANTED. That Plaintiff may proceed in this action without payment of an initial partial filing fee. That Plaintiff's custodian shall disburse from Plaintiff's inmate account monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to this inmate account until Plaintiff has paid the total filing fee of $350.00. See28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). Interference by Plaintiff in the submission of these funds will result in the dismissal of this action. that Plaintiff's custodian shall continue to disburse monthly payments from Plaintiffs inmate account until full payment of the filing fee has been paid to the Court, even after disposition of the case and regardless of whether relief is granted or denied. That the Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Orderto the Business Office, Attn: Inmate Accounts, Arapahoe County Detention Facility, Centennial, Colorado, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/31/2019.(mailed as Ordered)(evana, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Arapahoe County Public Defender's Office, and Katie Telfer, filed by James Julian Salazar.(agarc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salazar v. Arapahoe County Public Defender's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arapahoe County Public Defender's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Telfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie (I) Telfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Knopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura (I) Knopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Julian Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?