Martinez v. Williams et al
Petitioner: Ernest Martinez
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The, Mathew Hanson and Dean Williams
Case Number: 1:2019cv03093
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #9 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, by Respondents Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The, Mathew Hanson, Dean Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Brady, Christine)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time, ECF No. #8 , is GRANTED. Respondents shall have up to and including December 20, 2019, to file a Pre-Answer Response that complies with the Order to File Pre-Answer Response, ECF No. #5 . Applicant, within thirty days of the filing of the Pre- Answer Response, may reply if he desires, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/21/2019.(evana, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to by Respondents Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The, Mathew Hanson, Dean Williams. (Brady, Christine)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 ACCEPTANCE of Service of Order to Answer and Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus upon Dean Williams on 10/31/2019 (evana, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus and #5 Order to File Pre-Answer Response for Service of Process. (cmadr, )
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that within twenty-one days from the date of this Order the Respondents shall file a Pre-Answer Response that complies with this Order. That within twenty-one days of the Respondents filing the Pre-Answer Response, Applicant may file a Reply, if he desires. That if Respondents do not intend to raise either of the affirmative defenses of timeliness or exhaustion of state court remedies, or raise procedural default issues, the Respondents must notify the Court of that decision in the Pre-Answer Response. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/30/2019. (evana, )
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action, ECF No. #3 , is granted, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/30/2019.(evana, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action by Petitioner Ernest Martinez. (agarc, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2254, filed by Ernest Martinez.(agarc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Represented By: Christine Cates Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mathew Hanson
Represented By: Christine Cates Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dean Williams
Represented By: Christine Cates Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ernest Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?