Mares v. Goodrich et al
Defendant: Gary D. Fielder
Petitioner: Rogelio Manuel Mares
Respondent: Barry Goodrich and Phil Weiser
Case Number: 1:2019cv03106
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #8 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, by Respondents Barry Goodrich, Phil Weiser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Brady, Christine)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER. Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time, ECF No. #7 , is GRANTED. Respondents shall have up to and including December 26, 2019, to file a Pre-Answer Response that complies with the Order to File Pre-Answer Response, ECF No. #3 . Applicant, within thirty days of the filing of the Pre- Answer Response, may reply if he desires, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/25/2019.(angar, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to by Respondents Barry Goodrich, Phil Weiser. (Brady, Christine)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 Return Receipt re: #4 Certificate of Service. (rvill, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of Order to File Pre-Answer Response and Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Respondent, Philip Weiser, Attorney General for the State of Colorado. (rvill, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #3 Order to File Pre-Answer Response for Service of Process. (Attachments: #1 USPS Certified Mail Receipt) (rsams, )
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to File Pre-Answer Response. Within twenty-one days from the date of this Order Respondents shall file a Pre-Answer Response that complies with this Order and addresses exhaustion and timeliness. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/04/2019. (rvill, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2254 (Filing fee $ 5, Receipt Number 1082-6974529)Attorney Gary D. Fielder added to party Rogelio Manuel Mares(pty:pet), filed by Rogelio Manuel Mares. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Fielder, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mares v. Goodrich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary D. Fielder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Barry Goodrich
Represented By: Christine Cates Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Phil Weiser
Represented By: Christine Cates Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rogelio Manuel Mares
Represented By: Gary D. Fielder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?