De Young III v. Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.
Plaintiff: Charles (I) De Young III
Defendant: Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03163
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: FMLA
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 18 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #17 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-03163-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
January 3, 2020 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Charles (I) De Young III All parties do not consent.. (Swan, Andrew)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER granting #15 Motion to Reschedule Scheduling/Planning Conference. The Scheduling Conference is reset for 1/27/2020 at 11:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. The parties shall file their proposed Scheduling Order no later than 1/21/2020. The deadline for the parties to file their consent form remains set at 1/6/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/30/19. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
December 27, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #8 Order by Defendant Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.. (Harpole, Jennifer)
December 27, 2019 Filing 14 Defendant Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc..(Harpole, Jennifer)
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.. Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. answer due 12/27/2019. (Theis, Carolyn)
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Jennifer S. Harpole by Jennifer S. Harpole on behalf of Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.Attorney Jennifer S. Harpole added to party Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.(pty:dft) (Harpole, Jennifer)
November 20, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles (I) De Young III. Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. served on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. (Swan, Andrew)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul Forrest Lewis on behalf of Charles (I) De Young IIIAttorney Paul Forrest Lewis added to party Charles (I) De Young III(pty:pla) (Lewis, Paul)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Dickson Kuhn on behalf of Charles (I) De Young IIIAttorney Michael Dickson Kuhn added to party Charles (I) De Young III(pty:pla) (Kuhn, Michael)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/13/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 1/6/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/12/2019. (ksena)
November 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Carolyn Bailey Theis on behalf of Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.Attorney Carolyn Bailey Theis added to party Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.(pty:dft) (Theis, Carolyn)
November 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michelle Lynn Gomez on behalf of Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.Attorney Michelle Lynn Gomez added to party Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.(pty:dft) (Gomez, Michelle)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-03163-KMT. (athom, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (alave, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) Modified on 11/7/2019 to correct magistrate drawn (alave, ).
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6984989)Attorney Andrew Edward Swan added to party Charles De Young, III(pty:pla), filed by Charles De Young, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Swan, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Young III v. Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.
Represented By: Carolyn Bailey Theis
Represented By: Michelle Lynn Gomez
Represented By: Jennifer S. Harpole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles (I) De Young III
Represented By: Andrew Edward Swan
Represented By: Michael Dickson Kuhn
Represented By: Paul Forrest Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?