Bentley v. Target Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn Bentley
Defendant: Target Corporation and Doe Defendants 1 through 10
Case Number: 1:2019cv03183
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Service by E-Mail by Clerk of Court re 16 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court to sabra.millett@judicial.state.co.us. (apesa, )
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Remand to State Court by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/5/19. Text Only Entry(jdyne, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION to Remand to State Court by Defendant Target Corporation. (Chase, John)
December 4, 2019 Filing 14 DESIGNATION OF NON-PARTY at Fault by Defendant Target Corporation. (Chase, John)
December 4, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Target Corporation.(Chase, John)
November 20, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Target Corporation Attorney Rick Daniel Adams added to party Jacquelyn Bentley(pty:pla), filed by Jacquelyn Bentley.(Adams, Rick)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Target Corporation's answer is now due by 12/6/2019. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/15/19. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendant Target Corporation. (Chase, John)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/13/19. (rbjsec. )
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (trvo, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Doe Defendants 1 through 10, Target Corporation, filed by Jacquelyn Bentley.(trvo, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christy Noelle Redmond on behalf of Target CorporationAttorney Christy Noelle Redmond added to party Target Corporation(pty:dft) (Redmond, Christy)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal, Filing of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant Target Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Filing of State Court Docket Sheet)(Chase, John)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Chase, John)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Corporation from Denver District Court, Case Number 2019cv33797. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6988431), filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal, #6 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Chase, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bentley v. Target Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn Bentley
Represented By: Rick Daniel Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: John Roland Chase
Represented By: Christy Noelle Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?