Salazar-Lucero v. Mini Mart, Inc.
Plaintiff: Angelina Salazar-Lucero
Defendant: Mini Mart, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03197
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/7/2020. (ksena)
January 7, 2020 Filing 18 COURTROOM MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Scheduling Conference held on 1/7/2020, ( Discovery due by 6/1/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 7/15/2020.). FTR: COURTROOM101. (ksena)
December 31, 2019 Filing 17 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Angelina Salazar-Lucero. (Earl, Ryan)
December 31, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Mini Mart, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Jennings, Rachel)
December 11, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ryan Thomas Earl on behalf of Angelina Salazar-LuceroAttorney Ryan Thomas Earl added to party Angelina Salazar-Lucero(pty:pla) (Earl, Ryan)
November 18, 2019 Filing 14 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #13 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by attorney Rachel Truman Jennings. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant's ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Mini Mart, Inc..(Jennings, Rachel)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/7/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/14/2019. (ksena)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 11/13/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:Rachel Truman Jennings. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rachel Truman Jennings on behalf of Mini Mart, Inc.Attorney Rachel Truman Jennings added to party Mini Mart, Inc.(pty:dft) (Jennings, Rachel)
November 11, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, )
November 11, 2019 Filing 9 Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
November 11, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
November 11, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Defendants on 9 October, 2019 (cmadr, ) Modified to correct filing date on 11/13/2019 (cmadr, ).
November 11, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mini Mart, Inc., filed by Angelina Salazar-Lucero.(cmadr, ) Modified to correct filing date on 11/13/2019 (cmadr, ).
November 11, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Mini Mart, Inc., filed by Angelina Salazar-Lucero.(cmadr, ) Modified to correct filing date on 11/13/2019 (cmadr, ).
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Johnson, Katie)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mini Mart, Inc. from Pueblo County District Court, Case Number 2019CV030619. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6989862), filed by Mini Mart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - State Summons Loaf N Jug, #4 Exhibit D - State Summons EG, #5 Exhibit E- State Summons EG #2, #6 Exhibit F - State Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit G - ROS, #8 Exhibit H - Sec State - Mini Mart, #9 Exhibit I - State N. Intent Remove, #10 Exhibit J - State Register of Actions, #11 Civil Cover Sheet Fed Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Katie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salazar-Lucero v. Mini Mart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelina Salazar-Lucero
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Earl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mini Mart, Inc.
Represented By: Katie Berit Johnson
Represented By: Rachel Truman Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?