Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Mesh Suture Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Mark A Schwartz, Adom Dumanian, Gregory A Dumanian, Randa Dumanian and Mesh Suture Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03218
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 29 Emergency MOTION for Order to Automatic Stay Under Bankruptcy Code Section 362 Does Not Apply to This Interpleader Action by Defendants Adom Dumanian, Gregory A Dumanian, Randa Dumanian, Mesh Suture Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Johnson, Matthew)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: The Scheduling Conference which had been set for 1/15/2020 is hereby vacated. The parties and the Court will discuss future scheduling of hearings at the conclusion of the hearing set for 1/31/2020. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on January 8, 2020. Text Only Entry (gpgsec )
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: In Court Hearing to consider the matters in the Motion at [ECF #11] is hereby set for 1/31/2020 at 01:15 PM in Courtroom A 901 before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher, with the thanks of the Court to the parties for responding so quickly to Gallagher Chambers. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on January 7, 2020. Text Only Entry (gpgsec, )
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER: Defendant Mark Schwartz may lodge any response to the emergency motion to appoint a receiver (ECF #11) no later than 1/21/2020. The Court has availability for a hearing on this matter on January 31, 2020 at 1:15 p.m. in Denver. Within forty-eight (48) hours, the parties SHALL contact the Court's Clerk in Grand Junction and inform the Court as to their availability to hear this matter at that date and time. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/7/20. Text Only Entry (GPG)
January 6, 2020 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM regarding #11 Emergency MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by Randa Dumanian, Gregory A Dumanian, Mesh Suture Inc.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/6/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2, )
December 31, 2019 Filing 24 BRIEF in Support of #11 Emergency MOTION to Appoint Receiver (Second Supplemental Brief) filed by Defendants Adom Dumanian, Gregory A Dumanian, Randa Dumanian, Mesh Suture Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Johnson, Matthew)
December 27, 2019 Filing 23 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. All parties do not consent.. (Lee, Esther)
December 19, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Mark A Schwartz served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. (Dawes, Christopher)
December 3, 2019 Filing 21 BRIEF in Support of #11 Emergency MOTION to Appoint Receiver Supplemental Brief filed by Defendants Adom Dumanian, Gregory A Dumanian, Randa Dumanian, Mesh Suture Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6-1, #7 Exhibit 6-2, #8 Exhibit 6-3)(Johnson, Matthew)
December 3, 2019 Filing 20 Response to #11 Emergency MOTION to Appoint Receiver Non-Opposition by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Dawes, Christopher) Modified on 12/10/2019 to correct document title. (sphil, ).
November 27, 2019 Filing 19 REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Pursuant to #18 Minute Order, this action is directly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-03218-PAB-GPG. (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/27/2019. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court reassign this action to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher as the referral judge. All further pleadings in this case shall reflect the case number of 19-cv-03218-PAB-GPG. (athom, )
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/27/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER re: #11 Emergency MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by Randa Dumanian, Gregory A Dumanian, Mesh Suture Inc. The moving defendants shall submit supplemental authority as set forth in the attached Minute Order. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/25/19. (pabsec)
November 25, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-03218-PAB. (athom, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Dawes, Christopher)
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 Minute Order. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-03218-REB. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, )
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/25/2019. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). (tsher, )
November 23, 2019 Filing 11 Emergency MOTION to Appoint Receiver by Defendants Gregory A Dumanian, Randa Dumanian, Mesh Suture Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Founders Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Wells Fargo Bank Statements, #3 Exhibit 3 - Employment Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Term Letter & Email, #5 Exhibit 5 - Affidavit of Dr. Dumanian, #6 Exhibit 6 - Chart of all CC Charges, #7 Exhibit 7 - Invoices, #8 Exhibit 8 - Receiver History, #9 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Johnson, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Johnson, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Adom Dumanian, Gregory A Dumanian, Randa Dumanian, Mesh Suture Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Johnson, Matthew)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kimberly Briggs Still Berve on behalf of Adom Dumanian, Gregory A Dumanian, Randa Dumanian, Mesh Suture Inc.Attorney Kimberly Briggs Still Berve added to party Adom Dumanian(pty:dft), Attorney Kimberly Briggs Still Berve added to party Gregory A Dumanian(pty:dft), Attorney Kimberly Briggs Still Berve added to party Randa Dumanian(pty:dft), Attorney Kimberly Briggs Still Berve added to party Mesh Suture Inc.(pty:dft) (Berve, Kimberly)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/14/2019. Consent Form due by 12/29/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/26/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 1/15/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Esther H. Lee on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.Attorney Esther H. Lee added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:pla) (Lee, Esther)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (alave, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew E. Johnson on behalf of Adom Dumanian, Gregory A Dumanian, Randa Dumanian, Mesh Suture Inc.Attorney Matthew E. Johnson added to party Adom Dumanian(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew E. Johnson added to party Gregory A Dumanian(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew E. Johnson added to party Randa Dumanian(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew E. Johnson added to party Mesh Suture Inc.(pty:dft) (Johnson, Matthew)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Mesh Suture Inc.; Mark A. Schwartz; Randa Dumanian; Gregory A. dumanian; Adom Dumanian re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Dawes, Christopher)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adom Dumanian, Gregory A Dumanian, Randa Dumanian, Mesh Suture Inc., Mark A Schwartz (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6994972)Attorney Christopher J. Dawes added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:pla), filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dawes, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Mesh Suture Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adom Dumanian
Represented By: Matthew E. Johnson
Represented By: Kimberly Briggs Still Berve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory A Dumanian
Represented By: Matthew E. Johnson
Represented By: Kimberly Briggs Still Berve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randa Dumanian
Represented By: Matthew E. Johnson
Represented By: Kimberly Briggs Still Berve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesh Suture Inc.
Represented By: Matthew E. Johnson
Represented By: Kimberly Briggs Still Berve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Christopher J. Dawes
Represented By: Esther H. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?