Singey v. Boulder Valley School District et al
Plaintiff: Kathryn Singey
Defendant: Shely Langraf, Chavonne Gloster, Mike Cuskelly, Boulder Valley School District and Shelly Landgraf
Case Number: 1:2019cv03244
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
2 Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/8/20 GRANTING #13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Rajasimha Raghunath terminated as counsel of record. Plaintiff is now proceeding as pro se. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(nmarb, )
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney from Limited Representation filed by Kathryn Singey. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 1/6/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc2)
January 6, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #9 Amended Complaint for Service of Process. (Attachments: #1 USMS Service Form, #2 USMS Service Form) (cmadr, )
January 4, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney from Limited Representation by Plaintiff Kathryn Singey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Raghunath, Rajasimha)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on December 23, 2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc2)
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
December 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DRAWING CASE. After review pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1(a), the Court has determined that this case does not appear to be appropriate for summary dismissal. Case has been randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-03244-DDD. FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Marshals Service shall serve process on any Defendants for whom personal service is required. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/21/2019. (rvill, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Boulder Valley School District, Mike Cuskelly, Chavonne Gloster, Shely Langraf, filed by Kathryn Singey.(Raghunath, Rajasimha)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance to Provide Limited Representation by Rajasimha Raghunath on behalf of Kathryn Singey. (rvill, )
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 Leave to Provide Limited Scope Representation. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/04/2019.(rvill, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Limited Representation Counsel by Plaintiff Kathryn Singey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Entry of Appearance, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Raghunath, Rajasimha)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to File Amended Employment Discrimination Complaint. ORDERED that Plaintiff file, within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, an amended complaint, on the court-approved Employment Discrimination Complaint form, that complies with this order. If Plaintiff fails within the time allowed to file an amended employment discrimination complaint, or demonstrate good cause for obtaining an extension of time, this action will be dismissed without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/22/2019. (rvill, )
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. The Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No. #3 ) is GRANTED. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/21/2019. (rvill, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Kathryn Singey. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(rsams, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 Employment Discrimination COMPLAINT against Boulder Valley School District, Mike Cuskelly, Chavonne Gloster, Shely Langraf, filed by Kathryn Singey. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(rsams, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singey v. Boulder Valley School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shely Langraf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chavonne Gloster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Cuskelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boulder Valley School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly Landgraf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Singey
Represented By: Rajasimha Raghunath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?