Ricks-Bey v. Ricks et al
Plaintiff: Michael Todd Ricks-Bey
Defendant: Gwendolyn M. Vernon and Ronald W. Ricks
Case Number: 1:2019cv03270
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Michael Todd Ricks-Bey. (sphil, )
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Prisoner Complaint. ORDERED that Plaintiff file within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, an Amended Prisoner Complaint that complies with the directives in this order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall obtain the court-approved Prisoner Complaint form (with the assistance of his case manager or facilitys legal assistant), along with the applicable instructions, at www.cod.uscourts.gov. FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff fails to file an Amended Complaint within the time allowed, the Court may dismiss this action without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/19/2019. (apesa, )
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #2 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/18/2019. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order to DOC_inmateaccounts@state.co.us. (sphil, ). (email sent to DOC as ordered).
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED PRISONER COMPLAINT against Ronald W. Ricks, Gwendolyn M. Vernon, filed by Michael Todd Ricks-Bey.(sphil, )
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. If Plaintiff fails to cure all of the designated Deficiency within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/19/2019. (sphil, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Michael Todd Ricks-Bey. (cmadr, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 Verified COMPLAINT against Ronald W. Ricks, Gwendolyn M. Vernon, filed by Michael Todd Ricks-Bey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavits, #2 Exhibits, #3 Envelope)(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricks-Bey v. Ricks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Todd Ricks-Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolyn M. Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald W. Ricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?