MacDonald v. Tristar Risk Management et al
Plaintiff: Joshua MacDonald
Defendant: Safety National Casualty Company, Tristar Risk Management and Safety National Casualty Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv03312
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Safety National Casualty Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Protective Order)(Collier, Jessica)
January 15, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Ashley DeVerna by Ashley Jean DeVerna on behalf of Safety National Casualty CorporationAttorney Ashley Jean DeVerna added to party Safety National Casualty Corporation(pty:dft) (DeVerna, Ashley)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/15/2020. (morti, )
January 15, 2020 Filing 25 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/15/2020. Discovery due by 7/31/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 8/31/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/9/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. FTR: 402. (morti, )
January 13, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jesse Owen Brant on behalf of Tristar Risk ManagementAttorney Jesse Owen Brant added to party Tristar Risk Management(pty:dft) (Brant, Jesse)
January 8, 2020 Filing 23 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Joshua MacDonald. (Bisset, Jennifer)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #21 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/2/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2, )
December 31, 2019 Filing 21 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Joshua MacDonald All parties consent.. (Bisset, Jennifer)
December 20, 2019 Filing 20 STATEMENT re #9 First MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Tristar Risk Management by Defendant Tristar Risk Management. (Richter, Jasmina)
December 17, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Ashley DeVerna by Jessica Clark Collier on behalf of Safety National Casualty Corporation (Collier, Jessica)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER In light of the filing of #12 Answer and Jury Demand of Defendant Tristar Risk Management ("Tristar"), counsel for Tristar and counsel for Plaintiff shall meet and confer regarding whether #9 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default as to Tristar may either be withdrawn or denied as moot. The parties shall file a joint statement setting forth their respective positions on or before 12/20/2019. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 12/12/2019. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Safety National Casualty Corporation.(Collier, Jessica)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Defendant Safety National Casualty Corporation's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint until 12/5/2019, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 12/03/2019. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #5 Complaint by Defendant Safety National Casualty Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Order)(Collier, Jessica)
November 26, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jasmina Richter on behalf of Tristar Risk ManagementAttorney Jasmina Richter added to party Tristar Risk Management(pty:dft) (Richter, Jasmina)
November 26, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent TRISTAR Service Company, Inc. for Tristar Risk Management. (Proctor, Joshua)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #5 Complaint Answer and Jury Demand of Defendant TRISTAR Risk Management Attorney Joshua Robert Proctor added to party Tristar Risk Management(pty:dft) by Tristar Risk Management.(Proctor, Joshua)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/15/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 1/2/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/8/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 11/25/2019. (jgonz, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jessica Clark Collier on behalf of Safety National Casualty Corporation (Collier, Jessica)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 WITHDRAWN First MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Tristar Risk Management by Plaintiff Joshua MacDonald. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document Motion for Entry of Default, #2 Affidavit Supporting Entry of Default, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Entry of Default)(Bisset, Jennifer) Modified on 12/20/2019 to withdraw pursuant to STV CHAMBERS (jgonz, ).
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jennifer E. Bisset on behalf of Joshua MacDonaldAttorney Jennifer E. Bisset added to party Joshua MacDonald(pty:pla) (Bisset, Jennifer)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (alave, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Civil Summons and Civil Complaint and Jury Demand upon Tristar Risk Managment and Safety National Casualty Corporation on 10/24/2019 (alave, ) Modified to correct entry on 11/27/2019 (alave, ).
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Safety National Casualty Corporation, Tristar Risk Management, filed by Joshua MacDonald.(alave, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc. for Safety National Casualty Company. (Collier, Jessica)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Safety National Casualty Company from Weld County District Court, Colorado, Case Number 2019CV30865. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7011653), filed by Safety National Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Return of Service, #3 Exhibit C - State Ct. Civil Cover, #4 Exhibit D - State Ct. Docket & Pleadings, #5 Exhibit E - State Ct Ntc of Filing Ntc of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Collier, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MacDonald v. Tristar Risk Management et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua MacDonald
Represented By: Jennifer E. Bisset
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety National Casualty Company
Represented By: Jessica Clark Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tristar Risk Management
Represented By: Jasmina Richter
Represented By: Jesse Owen Brant
Represented By: Joshua Robert Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety National Casualty Corporation
Represented By: Jessica Clark Collier
Represented By: Ashley Jean DeVerna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?