Handy v. City of Aurora et al
Plaintiff: Wyatt T. Handy, Jr.
Defendant: Alex Sotelo, City of Aurora, Christopher Thrivierge, Christopher Yarborough, Josiah Coe and Anthony Nichols
Case Number: 1:2019cv03347
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint re: #1 Complaint filed by Wyatt T. Handy, Jr. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff file an Amended Complaint as instructed above, within thirty days from the date of this Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall obtain the proper Court-approved form, along with the applicable instructions, at www.cod.uscourts.gov for use in filing the Amended Complaint. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff fails to properly amend the Complaint, within thirty days from the date of this Order, the Complaint will be subject to dismissal for the reasons stated above, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/7/2020. (apesa, )
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED that the Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), ECF No. #3 , is GRANTED. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/2/2019.(apesa, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Plaintiff Wyatt T. Handy, Jr. (agarc, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Aurora, Josiah Coe, Anthony Nichols, Alex Sotelo, Christopher Thrivierge, and Christopher Yarborough, filed by Wyatt T. Handy, Jr.(agarc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Handy v. City of Aurora et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Sotelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Aurora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Thrivierge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Yarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josiah Coe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyatt T. Handy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?