Archuleta v. American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Plaintiff: Sherral Archuleta
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03398
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441bc
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Daniel Sean Smith is relieved of any further representation of Defendant. The Clerk of Court is instructed to terminate Attorney Smith as counsel of record, and to remove his name from the electronic certificate of mailing. Defendant shall continue to be represented by Attorneys Jason H. Klein and Michael D. Simpson. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/14/2020. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, )
January 14, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM regarding #21 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/14/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
January 14, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Smith, Daniel)
January 9, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jason H. Klein on behalf of American Strategic Insurance Corp.Attorney Jason H. Klein added to party American Strategic Insurance Corp.(pty:dft) (Klein, Jason)
December 17, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE - Register of Actions for Douglas County Case No. 2019CV30870 by Defendant American Strategic Insurance Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal of Case No. 2019CV30870 to Federal Court with Exhibits A-B)(Simpson, Michael)
December 11, 2019 Filing 19 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #16 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney John Scott Black. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (angar, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Related Cases by Defendant American Strategic Insurance Corp. (Simpson, Michael)
December 11, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for John Scott Black by Richard D. Daly on behalf of Sherral Archuleta (Daly, Richard)
December 11, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Richard D. Daly by Richard D. Daly on behalf of Sherral ArchuletaAttorney Richard D. Daly added to party Sherral Archuleta(pty:pla) (Daly, Richard)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 2/13/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Proposed Scheduling Order due on or before 2/6/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 12/9/19. (morti, )
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2018 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 1 2/9/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Magistrate Judge Varholak, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/9/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sean Bradley Leventhal on behalf of Sherral ArchuletaAttorney Sean Bradley Leventhal added to party Sherral Archuleta(pty:pla) (Leventhal, Sean)
December 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Shawn Sar on behalf of Sherral ArchuletaAttorney Jonathan Shawn Sar added to party Sherral Archuleta(pty:pla) (Sar, Jonathan)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (alave, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #6 Complaint For Damages and Jury Demand by American Strategic Insurance Corp..(alave, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Civil Summons and Civil Complaint and Jury Demand upon American Strategic Corp. on 11/12/2019. (alave, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against American Strategic Insurance Corp., filed by Sherral Archuleta.(alave, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel Sean Smith on behalf of American Strategic Insurance Corp.Attorney Daniel Sean Smith added to party American Strategic Insurance Corp.(pty:dft) (Smith, Daniel)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent ARX Holding Corp., Other Affiliate The Progessive Corporation for American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Simpson, Michael)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Strategic Insurance Corp. Pursant to 28 U.S.C. 1441(b) and 1446 from Douglas County District Court, Case Number 2019-CV-30870. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7024973), filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint for Damages and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit B - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Return of Service, #4 Exhibit D - District Court Civil Summons, #5 Exhibit E - Delay Reduction Order, #6 Exhibit F - Answer to Complaint for Damages and Jury Demand)(Simpson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Archuleta v. American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Represented By: Michael D. Simpson
Represented By: Daniel Sean Smith
Represented By: Jason H. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherral Archuleta
Represented By: Jonathan Shawn Sar
Represented By: Richard D. Daly
Represented By: Sean Bradley Leventhal
Represented By: John S. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?