Vertical Bridge Development, LLC v. City of Colorado Springs
Plaintiff: Vertical Bridge Development, LLC
Defendant: City of Colorado Springs
Case Number: 1:2019cv03476
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 0151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2019 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/ 5/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Magistrate Judge Tafoya, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/5/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-03476-WJM. (athom, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 15 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-03476-REB. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED ORDER SETTING Scheduling Conference for 3/3/2020 10:15 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 2/25/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/4/2020. (ksena)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Joint Motion for Leave to Reschedule Rule 16(b) Planning and Scheduling Conference and for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order. The Scheduling Conference set for February 10, 2020 has been VACATED, to be reset by separate order. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 02/04/20. Text Only Entry(kmtlc2)
February 3, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Vertical Bridge Development, LLC All parties do not consent.. (Zonies, Joseph)
February 3, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Leave to Reschedule Rule 16(b) Scheduling and Planning Conference and for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Vertical Bridge Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Zonies, Joseph)
January 31, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gregory Dalton Bentley on behalf of Vertical Bridge Development, LLCAttorney Gregory Dalton Bentley added to party Vertical Bridge Development, LLC(pty:pla) (Bentley, Gregory)
January 31, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph J. Zonies on behalf of Vertical Bridge Development, LLCAttorney Joseph J. Zonies added to party Vertical Bridge Development, LLC(pty:pla) (Zonies, Joseph)
January 27, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Initial Disclosures by Defendant City of Colorado Springs. (Stewart, Brian)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian Matthew Stewart on behalf of City of Colorado SpringsAttorney Brian Matthew Stewart added to party City of Colorado Springs(pty:dft) (Stewart, Brian)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Vertical Bridge Development, LLC. City of Colorado Springs waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (Connelly, Sean)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference set for 2/10/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 2/3/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/12/2019. (ksena)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Connelly, Sean)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against City of Colorado Springs (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7037691)Attorney Sean Connelly added to party Vertical Bridge Development, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Vertical Bridge Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Connelly, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vertical Bridge Development, LLC v. City of Colorado Springs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Colorado Springs
Represented By: Brian Matthew Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vertical Bridge Development, LLC
Represented By: Sean Connelly
Represented By: Joseph J. Zonies
Represented By: Gregory Dalton Bentley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?