Ocampo-Wiechmann v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Sylvia Ocampo-Wiechmann
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: USAO-SS-Noticing and SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2019cv03613
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER On January 27, 2020, Plaintiff filed a Letter, ECF No. #17 , in which she argues that jurisdiction is proper in Washington D.C and that this case should remain in the District of Columbia. As the United States District Court for the District of Columbia transferred this case to this Court Plaintiff's challenge of the transfer is more properly addressed by the District of Columbia. Nonetheless, this Court dismissed the instant action on January 24, 2020, see ECF No. 15, for failure to comply with a Court order, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 2/11/2020. (evana, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Danielle Alicia Pedderson on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney Danielle Alicia Pedderson added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Pedderson, Danielle)
January 27, 2020 Filing 17 Letter from Sylvia Ocampo (evana, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 16 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #15 Order of Dismissal on 1/24/2020. (angar, )
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER of Dismissal. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied without prejudice to the filing of a motion seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/24/2020. (angar, ) \(angar, ). Modified on 1/24/2020 to correct document (angar, ).
January 6, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by J. Benedict Garcia on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney J. Benedict Garcia added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Garcia, J.)
December 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint. ORDERED that Plaintiff file, within thirty days from the date of this Order, an amended complaint that complies with this Order. If Plaintiff fails within the time allowed to file an amended complaint that complies with this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/21/2019. (rvill, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (rsams, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-01320. File, transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's #9 Motion for Change of Venue, to which Plaintiff has filed no opposition or other response, is GRANTED by this court in accordance with Local Civil Rule 72.2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 11/6/2019. (lcjh) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/20/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff, who is proceeding pro se, shall file her opposition, or other response, to Defendant's Motion for Change of Venue #9 by no later than Monday, September 16, 2019. Plaintiff is advised that if she does not do so, the Court may treat Defendant's Motion for Change of Venue as conceded. See Local Civil Rule 7(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 8/19/2019. (lcdar3, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/20/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Change Venue by COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reed, Margaret) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/20/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/12/2019. (tth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/20/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/17/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/15/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/12/2019. (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/20/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY served on 7/2/2019. (tth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/20/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zmc) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/20/2019.]
May 29, 2019 CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson for full case management up to and excluding trial. (zad) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/20/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING Case to Random Magistrate Judge for Full Case Management. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/29/2019. (lcjeb2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/20/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/20/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIAT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED". Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/22/2019. (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/20/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by SYLVIA OCAMPO-WIECHMANN (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/20/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY filed by SYLVIA OCAMPO-WIECHMANN. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/20/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 05/06/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/20/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ocampo-Wiechmann v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USAO-SS-Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Represented By: Danielle Alicia Pedderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Ocampo-Wiechmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?