U.S. Bank N.A. v. Denton et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank N.A.
Defendant: United States of America, The, Ridge & Valley Realty, Inc., Internal Revenue Service, Bruce Allen Denton, Colorado Department of Labor and Employment, Wakefield and Associates, Inc., Henry H. Parker, Dennis Smith, Regina Jo Denton, Unemployment Insurance Employer Services and Ridge & Valley Realty, Inc. doing business as Credit Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03623
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED ORDER SETTING Scheduling Conference for 3/24/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 3/17/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/14/2020. (ksena)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER granting #16 Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference set for February 18, 2020, is vacated, to be reset by separate order. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/14/20. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
February 13, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Vacate and Reset Scheduling/Planning Conference Scheduled for February 18, 2020 by Plaintiff U.S. Bank N.A.. (Chin, Randall)
January 24, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint, by Internal Revenue Service.(Halasz, Ty)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Internal Revenue Service answer due 1/26/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/2/20. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
December 31, 2019 Filing 13 Renewed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Halasz, Ty)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 2/18/2020 10:15 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 2/11/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/30/2019. (ksena)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond, for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(a). By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/30/19. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Halasz, Ty)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rsams, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 STATE COURT ORDER Re Second Motion for Enlargement of Time to Serve Defendants Pursuant to C.R.C.P 4 (m), by Otero County District Court Judge Michael Andrew Schiferl, on December 11, 2019. (rsams, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 STATE COURT ORDER Re Motion for Enlargement of Time to Serve Defendants Pursuant to C.R.C.P 4(m), by Otero County District Court Judge Michael Andrew Schiferl, on November 05, 2019. (rsams, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 105 against Colorado Department of Labor and Employment, Bruce Allen Denton, Regina Jo Denton, Internal Revenue Service, Henry H. Parker, Ridge & Valley Realty, Inc., Dennis Smith, Unemployment Insurance Employer Services, Wakefield and Associates, Inc., filed by U.S. Bank N.A..(rsams, ) Modified to correct file date on 12/23/2019 (rsams, ).
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STATE COURT ORDER Re Motion to Correct Clerical Error in Docket, by Judge Michael Schiferl, Otero County district Court, on September 10, 2019. (rsams, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 105 against Colorado Department of Labor and Employment, Bruce Allen Denton, Regina Jo Denton, Internal Revenue Service, Henry H. Parker, Ridge & Valley Realty, Inc., Dennis Smith, Unemployment Insurance Employer Services, Wakefield and Associates, Inc., filed by U.S. Bank N.A..(rsams, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (rsams, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America, The from Otero County Combined Court, Case Number 2019CV30064., filed by United States of America, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Registry of Action, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Notice of Lis Pendens, #4 Exhibit Motion to Correct Clerical Error in Docket, #5 Exhibit First Amended Notice of Lis Pendens, #6 Exhibit Order on Motion to Correct Clerical Error in Docket, #7 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit Second Amended Notice of Lis Pendens, #9 Exhibit Entry of Appearance for Defendant Henry H. Parker, #10 Exhibit First Motion for Enlargement of Time to Serve Defendants, #11 Exhibit Order on First Motion for Enlargement of Time to Serve Defendants, #12 Exhibit Second Motion for Enlargement of Time to Serve Defendants, #13 Exhibit Order on Second Motion for Enlargement of Time to Serve Defendants, #14 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Exhibit Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet for Notices of Removal)(Halasz, Ty)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank N.A. v. Denton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank N.A.
Represented By: Randall M. Chin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, The
Represented By: Ty Halasz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ridge & Valley Realty, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Ty Halasz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Allen Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Department of Labor and Employment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wakefield and Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry H. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regina Jo Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unemployment Insurance Employer Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ridge & Valley Realty, Inc. doing business as Credit Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?