Nelson v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Plaintiff: Christopher A. Nelson
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation, a/k/a AMTRAK
Case Number: 1:2020cv00132
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER Due to current concerns regarding potential transmission of COVID-19, during the week of March 16, 2020, all hearings and conferences before Magistrate Judge Hegarty will be conducted by telephone unless otherwise requested by counsel or a pro se party. Counsel and any unrepresented non-prisoner parties shall first teleconference together, then call my chambers at 303-844-4507 at the appointed time of the hearing or conference. Counsel for Defendant(s) in any prisoner action shall attempt to arrange a teleconference with the corrections facility first before calling my chambers at the appointed time. Any questions regarding this procedure may be directed to my chambers at the above-referenced telephone number or at hegarty_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 03/14/2020. Text Only Entry (mehlc1, )
March 12, 2020 Filing 13 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Christopher A. Nelson. (Cohen, Christopher)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/9/2020. Scheduling Conference is VACATED and RESET to 3/19/2020 11:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
February 26, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Carafelli, Andrew)
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation a/k/a Amtrak's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Andrew James Carafelli added to party National Railroad Passenger Corporation(pty:dft) by National Railroad Passenger Corporation.(Carafelli, Andrew)
January 28, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher A. Nelson. National Railroad Passenger Corporation served on 1/20/2020, answer due 2/10/2020. (Cohen, Christopher)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/17/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 3/18/2020 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/17/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/17/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorney Christopher Cohen.Attorney has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number COX093626 (cmadr, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Railroad Passenger Corporation, a/k/a AMTRAK (Filing fee $ 400).Attorney Christopher Cohen added to party Christopher A. Nelson(pty:pla), filed by Christopher A. Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cohen, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher A. Nelson
Represented By: Christopher Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation, a/k/a AMTRAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?