Castro v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Gabriel Villegas Castro
Respondent: Matthew Albence, Chad Wolf, Johnny Choate, John Martinez and William P. BARR
Case Number: 1:2020cv00133
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241in
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Habeas Petition by Petitioner Gabriel Villegas Castro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lunn, Laura)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Response #11 , Petitioner may file any reply on or before March 10, 2020. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/25/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
February 25, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Respondents Matthew Albence, William Barr, Johnny Choate, John Martinez, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Vaughn Davison)(Kellogg, Ian)
February 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ian J. Kellogg on behalf of Matthew Albence, William Barr, Johnny Choate, John Martinez, Chad WolfAttorney Ian J. Kellogg added to party Matthew Albence(pty:res), Attorney Ian J. Kellogg added to party William Barr(pty:res), Attorney Ian J. Kellogg added to party Johnny Choate(pty:res), Attorney Ian J. Kellogg added to party John Martinez(pty:res), Attorney Ian J. Kellogg added to party Chad Wolf(pty:res) (Kellogg, Ian)
January 21, 2020 Filing 9 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #8 Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information filed by attorney Laura Patricia Lunn.The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Laura Patricia Lunn (Lunn, Laura)
January 17, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:Laura Patricia Lunn. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee: $5, receipt number: COX093643. (trvo, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 Administrative Notice: No filing fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to William Barr; Matthew Albence; Chad Wolf; John Martinez; and Johnny Choate by Petitioner Gabriel Villegas Castro. (Lunn, Laura)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 First APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241 (Filing fee $ 5)Attorney Laura Patricia Lunn added to party Gabriel Villegas Castro(pty:pet), filed by Gabriel Villegas Castro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-N)(Lunn, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castro v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Albence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Johnny Choate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gabriel Villegas Castro
Represented By: Laura Patricia Lunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?