Audax Electronics, LLC et al v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: AUDAX ELECTRONICS, LLC and Victor BIZ MALASSISE
Defendant: Acting Secretary CHAD F. WOLF, Acting Director Kenneth CUCCINELLI and KATHY A. BARAN
Case Number: 1:2020cv00147
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE ON ALL defendant(s) Kathy A. Baran served on 2/14/2020, answer due 4/14/2020; Kenneth Cuccinelli served on 2/14/2020, answer due 4/14/2020; Chad F. Wolf served on 2/14/2020, answer due 4/14/2020. (Casey, Jennifer)
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Timothy Bart Jafek on behalf of Kathy A. Baran, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Chad F. WolfAttorney Timothy Bart Jafek added to party Kathy A. Baran(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Bart Jafek added to party Kenneth Cuccinelli(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Bart Jafek added to party Chad F. Wolf(pty:dft) (Jafek, Timothy)
February 3, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) Kathy A. Baran served on 1/24/2020, answer due 3/24/2020; Kenneth Cuccinelli served on 1/24/2020, answer due 3/24/2020; Chad F. Wolf served on 1/24/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (Casey, Jennifer)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 01/24/2020. (athom, )
January 21, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KATHY A. BARAN, Kenneth CUCCINELLI, CHAD F. WOLF (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7104202)Attorney Jennifer Rilen Casey added to party AUDAX ELECTRONICS, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer Rilen Casey added to party Victor BIZ MALASSISE(pty:pla), filed by AUDAX ELECTRONICS, LLC, Victor BIZ MALASSISE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - L1 A Petition, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - USCIS RFE, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Response to RFE, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - USCIS Denial, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Summons Wolf, #9 Summons Cuccinelli, #10 Summons Baran, #11 Summons Barr, #12 Summons Dunn)(Casey, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Audax Electronics, LLC et al v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary CHAD F. WOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHY A. BARAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUDAX ELECTRONICS, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Rilen Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor BIZ MALASSISE
Represented By: Jennifer Rilen Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?