Barnes v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Plaintiff: Darrell Barnes
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00206
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #14 MOTION to Bifurcate Plaintiff's Extra-Contractual Claims and Stay Related Discovery filed by Plaintiff Darrell Barnes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Detsky, Adam)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER The Scheduling Conference set for 3/17/2020 11:00 AM is VACATED and RESET for 5/6/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/13/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Standing Order Regarding Appearances for Certain Civil Non-Evidentiary Proceedings for Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/11/2020. (jgonz, )
March 9, 2020 Filing 17 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Darrell Barnes. (Detsky, Adam)
March 4, 2020 Filing 16 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #13 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Adam J. Detsky. The format for the attorneys signature block is not correct. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(d) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases). (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The All parties do not consent.. (O'Connor, Sean)
February 26, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Bifurcate Plaintiff's Extra-Contractual Claims and Stay Related Discovery by Defendant Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion to Bifurcate (Orders), #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(O'Connor, Sean)
January 29, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Adam J. Detsky on behalf of Darrell BarnesAttorney Adam J. Detsky added to party Darrell Barnes(pty:pla) (Detsky, Adam)
January 28, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #7 Complaint by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The.(O'Connor, Sean)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/17/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/10/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/27/2020. (jgonz, )
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/27/20. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
January 24, 2020 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rsams, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint and Jury Demand upon Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The on January 03, 2020. (rsams, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 7 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The, filed by Darrell Barnes.(rsams, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (rsams, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance on Behalf of Defendant by Sean Patrick O'Connor on behalf of The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance CompanyAttorney Sean Patrick O'Connor added to party The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company(pty:dft) (O'Connor, Sean)
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal,,, of Filing State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Filing State Court Docket)(Jones, Max)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers IndemnityCompany, Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. for The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Jones, Max)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company from Denver Dist Court, Case Number 19cv34357. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7115439), filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal (Policy), #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal (State Court Civil Cover), #4 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal (SOS Corp Summ), #5 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal (Demand Ltr), #6 Exhibit F to Notice of Removal (Bendinelli Ltr), #7 Exhibit G to Notice of Removal (State Court AOS), #8 Exhibit H to Notice of Removal (State Court Waiver), #9 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Jones, Max)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Max K. Jones, Jr.
Represented By: Sean Patrick O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?