Agworld, Inc. et al v. Pompeo et al
Plaintiff: Agworld, Inc. and Reinder Prins
Defendant: Christopher A. Wray, Act DHS Sec. Kevin MCALEENAN, Secretary of State Michael POMPEO, William P. BARR, denison offutt, Michael R. Pompeo, Kevin McAleenan and William Barr
Case Number: 1:2020cv00251
Filed: January 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER: The Status Conference has been reset for 5/19/2020 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/13/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
March 10, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) All Defendants. (Steele-Kaplan, Cristina)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate 6 Minute Order and Reset Status Conference. The Status Conference set March 12, 2020 is vacated. The Court requests that counsel jointly contact Chambers at jackson_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov or (303) 844-4694 within one week to reschedule. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/10/2020. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.)
March 9, 2020 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate 6 Minute Order and Reset Status Conference by Defendants William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, Denison Offutt, Michael R. Pompeo, Christopher A. Wray. (Brenton, Kyle)
March 9, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kyle W. Brenton on behalf of William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, Denison Offutt, Michael R. Pompeo, Christopher A. WrayAttorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party William Barr(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party Kevin McAleenan(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party Denison Offutt(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party Michael R. Pompeo(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party Christopher A. Wray(pty:dft) (Brenton, Kyle)
March 2, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (apesa, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS REQUEST as to US Attorney's Office by Plaintiffs Agworld, Inc., Reinder Prins. (Steele-Kaplan, Cristina)
February 24, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Steven Parker (Steele-Kaplan, Cristina) Modified on 2/24/2020 to correct text (apesa, ).
February 24, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Anthony Killeen (Steele-Kaplan, Cristina) Modified on 2/24/2020 to correct text (apesa, ).
February 24, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Anthony Killeen (Steele-Kaplan, Cristina) Modified on 2/24/2020 to correct text(apesa, ).
February 24, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Michelle Perry (Steele-Kaplan, Cristina) Modified on 2/24/2020 to correct text (apesa, ).
February 24, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Gail Allen (Steele-Kaplan, Cristina) Modified on 2/24/2020 to correct text (apesa, ).
February 24, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) Kevin McAleenan served on 2/7/2020, answer due 4/7/2020. (Steele-Kaplan, Cristina)
February 24, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) Christopher A. Wray served on 2/5/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. (Steele-Kaplan, Cristina)
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) Michael R. Pompeo served on 2/4/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. (Steele-Kaplan, Cristina)
February 24, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) Denison Offutt served on 2/4/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. (Steele-Kaplan, Cristina)
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) William Barr served on 2/4/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. (Steele-Kaplan, Cristina)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: An in-person Status Conference is set for 3/12/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/18/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
February 11, 2020 Filing 5 CASE REASSIGNED. This case was drawn in error to the AP Docket and is therefore randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-00251-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (rsams, )
February 11, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. William Barr served on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020. (Steele-Kaplan, Cristina)
January 31, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rsams, )
January 30, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
January 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William P. BARR, Kevin MCALEENAN, Michael POMPEO, Christopher A. Wray, denison offutt (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7124698)Attorney Cristina O. Steele-Kaplan added to party Agworld, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Cristina O. Steele-Kaplan added to party Reinder Prins(pty:pla), filed by Agworld, Inc., Reinder Prins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons)(Steele-Kaplan, Cristina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agworld, Inc. et al v. Pompeo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Wray
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Act DHS Sec. Kevin MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of State Michael POMPEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: denison offutt
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Pompeo
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agworld, Inc.
Represented By: Cristina O. Steele-Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reinder Prins
Represented By: Cristina O. Steele-Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?