Bushansky v. Tallgrass Energy, LP et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Bushansky
Defendant: Tallgrass Energy, LP, Guy G. Buckley, Terrance D. Towner, Thomas A. Gerke, Matthew J.K. Runkle, Marcelino Oreja Arburua, Roy N. Cook, Wallace C. Henderson and William R. Moler
Case Number: 1:2020cv00356
Filed: February 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER In light of #14 Unopposed Motion to Adjourn Scheduling Conference and to Extend Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (the "Motion"), the Scheduling Conference set for 4/28/2020 10:00 AM, and related deadlines, are VACATED. The deadline for the parties to file the Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form remains 4/14/2020. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the operative complaint is extended until a date to be set when the Court rules on the Motion. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 3.2, "[a] party to a case shall file a notice identifying all cases pending in this or any other federal, state, or foreign jurisdiction that are related to the case." In the Motion, the parties indicate that there are additional cases that "assert[ ] substantially the same claim or claims" as the instant lawsuit, but none of those cases is identified in the Motion and neither party has filed a notice of related cases as required by D.C.COLO.LCivR 3.2. Accordingly, on or before 4/14/2020, the parties shall file a notice of related cases and a status report regarding the expected timing for the anticipated motion for the appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/07/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, and Adjourn Scheduling Conference by Defendants Marcelino Oreja Arburua, Guy G. Buckley, Roy N. Cook, Thomas A. Gerke, Wallace C. Henderson, William R. Moler, Matthew J.K. Runkle, Tallgrass Energy, LP, Terrance D. Towner. (Allen, Matthew)
February 14, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stephen Bushansky. Terrance D. Towner waiver sent on 2/13/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (Acocelli, Richard)
February 14, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stephen Bushansky. Matthew J.K. Runkle waiver sent on 2/13/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (Acocelli, Richard)
February 14, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stephen Bushansky. Wallace C. Henderson waiver sent on 2/13/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (Acocelli, Richard)
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stephen Bushansky. Thomas A. Gerke waiver sent on 2/13/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (Acocelli, Richard)
February 14, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stephen Bushansky. Roy N. Cook waiver sent on 2/13/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (Acocelli, Richard)
February 14, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stephen Bushansky. Guy G. Buckley waiver sent on 2/13/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (Acocelli, Richard)
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stephen Bushansky. Marcelino Oreja Arburua waiver sent on 2/13/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (Acocelli, Richard)
February 14, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stephen Bushansky. William R. Moler waiver sent on 2/13/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (Acocelli, Richard)
February 14, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stephen Bushansky. Tallgrass Energy, LP waiver sent on 2/13/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (Acocelli, Richard)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/28/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 4/14/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/21/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 2/12/2020. (jgonz, )
February 11, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (rsams, )
February 11, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
February 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marcelino Oreja Arburua, Guy G. Buckley, Roy N. Cook, Thomas A. Gerke, Wallace C. Henderson, William R. Moler, Matthew J.K. Runkle, Tallgrass Energy, LP, Terrance D. Towner (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7147932)Attorney Richard Adam Acocelli added to party Stephen Bushansky(pty:pla), filed by Stephen Bushansky. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Acocelli, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bushansky v. Tallgrass Energy, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tallgrass Energy, LP
Represented By: Matthew B. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy G. Buckley
Represented By: Matthew B. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrance D. Towner
Represented By: Matthew B. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A. Gerke
Represented By: Matthew B. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew J.K. Runkle
Represented By: Matthew B. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcelino Oreja Arburua
Represented By: Matthew B. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy N. Cook
Represented By: Matthew B. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace C. Henderson
Represented By: Matthew B. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R. Moler
Represented By: Matthew B. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Bushansky
Represented By: Richard Adam Acocelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?