InfoCision Management Corporation v. Griswold
Plaintiff: Infocision Management Corporation
Defendant: Jena Griswold
Case Number: 1:2020cv00357
Filed: February 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 vc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Emily B. Buckley on behalf of Jena GriswoldAttorney Emily B. Buckley added to party Jena Griswold(pty:dft) (Buckley, Emily)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER. In accordance with efforts to minimize the spread of the coronavirus, the Scheduling Conference set on April 15, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to June 10, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. The proposed Scheduling Order is due by June 3, 2020. Any conflicts with the new setting shall be addressed by filing a motion. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on March 26, 2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc1, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 Entry of Appearance by attorney Michael Gross for Plaintiff InfoCision Management Corporation. (MOTION for Leave to Appear) by Plaintiff InfoCision Management Corporation. (Gross, Michael) Modified on 3/6/2020 (nmarb, ). Entry amended pursuant to direction from the chambers of Magistate Judge Mix.
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/12/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 4/8/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 4/15/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
February 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Grant T. Sullivan on behalf of Jena GriswoldAttorney Grant T. Sullivan added to party Jena Griswold(pty:dft) (Sullivan, Grant)
February 12, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by InfoCision Management Corporation. Jena Griswold waiver sent on 2/11/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (Donnelly, Karen)
February 11, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rsams, )
February 11, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
February 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jena Griswold (Filing fee $ 400).Attorney Karen Michelle Donnelly added to party Infocision Management Corporation(pty:pla), filed by Infocision Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supp. Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Summons Summons)(Donnelly, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: InfoCision Management Corporation v. Griswold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jena Griswold
Represented By: Grant T. Sullivan
Represented By: Emily B. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Infocision Management Corporation
Represented By: Karen Michelle Donnelly
Represented By: Michael William Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?