Hickey v. National Association of Letter Carriers, AFL-CIO
Plaintiff: Lynda Hickey
Defendant: National Association of Letter Carriers and National Association of Letter Carriers, AFL-CIO
Case Number: 1:2020cv00358
Filed: February 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 bfd
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to #19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Response, #17 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Defendant National Association of Letter Carriers, AFL-CIO. (Swearengen, Kate)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/7/2020. (morti, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 23 MINUTE ENTRY for Telephonic Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/7/2020. Discovery due by 10/9/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 11/6/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/9/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. FTR: 402. (morti, )
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER. The Court has updated the procedures for the parties to participate telephonically in hearings before this Court. Accordingly, the parties are instructed to call 888.808.6929 at the scheduled time on 4/7/2020. The access code is: 2805116#. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. The Court thanks the parties in advance for their patience and flexibility as the Court implements this new technology. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/6/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER Pursuant to District Court General Order 2020-3 and in an effort to limit the need for Court staff to travel, the Scheduling Conference set for 4/8/2020 10:00 AM is VACATED and RESET for 4/7/2020 08:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall appear telephonically by initiating a call among all participants and then calling the Court at 303.335.2365 at the scheduled time. If the rescheduled date or time is not convenient for any party, counsel (or individuals with access to their calendars) should confer and jointly call chambers at 303.335.2365 to reschedule the matter to a mutually convenient date and time. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/30/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
March 27, 2020 Filing 20 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Lynda Hickey. (Liechty, Robert)
March 24, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #17 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Lynda Hickey. (Liechty, Robert) Modified on 3/24/2020 correct event type (jgonz, ).
March 13, 2020 Filing 18 BRIEF in Support of #17 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Defendant National Association of Letter Carriers, AFL-CIO. (Swearengen, Kate)
March 13, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Defendant National Association of Letter Carriers, AFL-CIO. (Swearengen, Kate)
March 10, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of federal diversity jurisdiction by Plaintiff Lynda Hickey (Liechty, Robert)
March 10, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by National Association of Letter Carriers, AFL-CIO.(Swearengen, Kate)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until 3/10/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/05/2020. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant National Association of Letter Carriers, AFL-CIO. (Reinken, William)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #11 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/18/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
February 14, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant National Association of Letter Carriers, AFL-CIO All parties consent.. (Reinken, William)
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kate Montgomery Swearengen on behalf of National Association of Letter Carriers, AFL-CIOAttorney Kate Montgomery Swearengen added to party National Association of Letter Carriers, AFL-CIO(pty:dft) (Swearengen, Kate)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/8/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 3/25/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/1/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 2/12/2020. (jgonz, )
February 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William Richard Reinken on behalf of National Association of Letter Carriers, AFL-CIOAttorney William Richard Reinken added to party National Association of Letter Carriers, AFL-CIO(pty:dft) (Reinken, William)
February 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stanley Miller Gosch on behalf of National Association of Letter Carriers, AFL-CIO (Gosch, Stanley)
February 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert Mark Liechty on behalf of Lynda HickeyAttorney Robert Mark Liechty added to party Lynda Hickey(pty:pla) (Liechty, Robert)
February 11, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rsams, )
February 11, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against National Association of Letter Carriers, AFL-CIO, filed by Lynda Hickey.(rsams, )
February 11, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
February 11, 2020 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (rsams, )
February 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by National Association of Letter Carriers from Larimer County Court, Case Number 2020CV030052. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7148194), filed by National Association of Letter Carriers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint Filed in State Ct & Underlying Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Gosch, Stanley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hickey v. National Association of Letter Carriers, AFL-CIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Association of Letter Carriers
Represented By: Stanley Miller Gosch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Association of Letter Carriers, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Stanley Miller Gosch
Represented By: William Richard Reinken
Represented By: Kate Montgomery Swearengen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynda Hickey
Represented By: Robert Mark Liechty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?