Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Venture Capital Investments LTD et al
Plaintiff: Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Defendant: Breonna S. Clark, Eliot Clark, Alexander Pak, Venture Capital Investments LTD and Breonna S. Clark also known as Eliot Clark also known as Alexander Pak doing business as Venture Capital Investments and The Life Group
Case Number: 1:2020cv00382
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 0001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/30/2020. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 4/8/2020 is VACATED. (tsher, )
March 30, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Continued Compliance with the Court's February 14, 2020 Order by Plaintiff Commodity Futures Trading Commission (Attachments: #1 Draft Scheduling Order)(Bruno, Kim)
March 23, 2020 Filing 23 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Venture Capital Investments LTD re #20 MOTION for Entry of Default, by Clerk. Text Only Entry (athom, )
March 23, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Affidavit Supporting Application for Default by Plaintiff Commodity Futures Trading Commission (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Declaration of Kevin Samuel in Support of Application for Default by the Clerk of the Court)(Bruno, Kim)
March 23, 2020 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTE REGARDING DEFAULT. Clerk's Entry of Default will not be entered as to Venture Capital Investments LTD re #20 MOTION for Entry of Default as: the affidavit or declaration required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a) was not filed, by Clerk. Text Only Entry (athom, )
March 23, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Venture Capital Investments, LTD by Plaintiff Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Clerk's Default of Venture Capital Investments)(Bruno, Kim)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 3/18/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
March 18, 2020 Filing 18 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #16 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-00382-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, )
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER re: #16 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/18/2020. Parties do not consent. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C.Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). (tsher, )
March 18, 2020 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Commodity Futures Trading Commission All parties do not consent.. (Bruno, Kim)
March 18, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Compliance with the Court's February 14, 2020 Order by Plaintiff Commodity Futures Trading Commission (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Declaration of Kim Bruno in Support of Notice of Compliance)(Bruno, Kim)
March 17, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTE REGARDING DEFAULT Default will not be entered as to Venture Capital Investments LTD re #12 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Venture Capital Investments LTD as: the time to answer or otherwise respond has not expired, by Clerk. Text Only Entry (tsher, )
March 17, 2020 Filing 13 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Breonna S. Clark, by Clerk. Text Only Entry. (tsher, )
March 13, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Venture Capital Investments LTD by Plaintiff Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Clerk Default - Venture Capital Investment LTD)(Bruno, Kim)
March 13, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Breonna S. Clark by Plaintiff Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 Declaration in Support of Clerk Default_Redacted, #2 Proposed Clerk Default - Breonna Clark)(Bruno, Kim)
March 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE re #8 Summons Returned Executed, #6 Summons Returned Executed Corrected Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff Commodity Futures Trading Commission (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Declaration of Michael Rosedale, #2 Attachment B - Corrected Affidavit of Service on Defendant Breonna S. Clark, #3 Attachment C - Corrected Affidavit of Service on Defendant Venture Capital Investments, LTD)(Bruno, Kim)
March 13, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Bruno, Kim)
March 3, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. Breonna S. Clark served on 2/18/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Bruno, Kim)
March 3, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. Venture Capital Investments LTD served on 2/27/2020, answer due 3/19/2020. (Bruno, Kim)
March 3, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. Venture Capital Investments LTD served on 2/18/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Bruno, Kim)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/14/2020. Consent Form due by 3/19/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 4/8/2020 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Cases by Plaintiff Commodity Futures Trading Commission (Bruno, Kim)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief, Restitution, Civil Monetary Penalties and Other Equitable Relief against Breonna S. Clark, Venture Capital Investments LTD Attorney Kim Gordon Bruno added to party Commodity Futures Trading Commission(pty:pla), filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued to Breonna S. Clark, #2 Summons issued to Venture Capital Investments LTD, #3 Summons issued to Venture Capital Investments LTD, Registered Agent, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bruno, Kim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Venture Capital Investments LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breonna S. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eliot Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Pak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venture Capital Investments LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breonna S. Clark also known as Eliot Clark also known as Alexander Pak doing business as Venture Capital Investments and The Life Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: Kim Gordon Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?