Boldt et al v. American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Plaintiff: William Boldt and Sara Boldt
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00578
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER granting #20 Parties Joint Request to Appear Telephonically at the Scheduling Conference. The parties shall initiate a conference call and contact chambers, 719-575-0328, at the scheduled time. The parties shall use a LAND LINE; NO CELLULAR, CORDLESS OR SPEAKER PHONES ARE PERMITTED. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 04/30/20. Text Only Entry(kmtlc2)
April 30, 2020 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the Scheduling Conference by Defendant American Strategic Insurance Corp., and by Plaintiffs Sara Boldt, William Boldt. (Burchard, Timothy)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/16/2020. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-578-KMT (angar, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 18 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant American Strategic Insurance Corp. All parties consent.. (Simpson, Michael)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 6/2/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/7/2020. (ksena)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2019 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 4 /6/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Magistrate Judge Tafoya, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/6/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-00578-WJM. (athom, )
March 9, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of State Court Register of Actions [20CV30203 El Paso County District Court] - William Boldt, et al. v. American Strategic Insurance Corp. by Defendant American Strategic Insurance Corp. (Simpson, Michael)
March 4, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Timothy Graham Burchard, II on behalf of Sara Boldt, William BoldtAttorney Timothy Graham Burchard, II added to party Sara Boldt(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Graham Burchard, II added to party William Boldt(pty:pla) (Burchard, Timothy)
March 4, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Edward Bukowski on behalf of Sara Boldt, William BoldtAttorney Jonathan Edward Bukowski added to party Sara Boldt(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Edward Bukowski added to party William Boldt(pty:pla) (Bukowski, Jonathan)
March 2, 2020 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (alave, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 9 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 8 Defendant American Strategic Insurance Corp.'s ANSWER to #6 Complaint and Jury Demand by American Strategic Insurance Corp.(alave, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Civil Summons and Amended Complaint and Jury Demand upon American Strategic Insurance Corp. on 02/10/2020 (alave, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against American Strategic Insurance Corp., filed by William Boldt, Sara Boldt.(alave, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jason H. Klein on behalf of American Strategic Insurance Corp.Attorney Jason H. Klein added to party American Strategic Insurance Corp.(pty:dft) (Klein, Jason)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Cases by Defendant American Strategic Insurance Corp. (Simpson, Michael)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent ARX Holding Corp., Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Simpson, Michael)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Strategic Insurance Corp. from El Paso County District Court, Case Number 2020-CV-30203. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7180306), filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Affidavit of Service on American Strategic Insurance Corp., #4 Exhibit D - State Court Summons, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Defendant's Answer to Complaint and Jury Demand)(Simpson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boldt et al v. American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Represented By: Jason H. Klein
Represented By: Michael D. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Boldt
Represented By: Timothy Graham Burchard, II
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Bukowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Boldt
Represented By: Timothy Graham Burchard, II
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Bukowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?