Gutierrez v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Jose Medelso Ramirez Gutierrez
Defendant: Andrew Lambrecht, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Chad F. Wolf, Donald Neufeld and Angela K. Goldinger
Case Number: 1:2020cv00587
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/30/2020. The court shall hold a scheduling conference on 6/8/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang via telephone conference. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed scheduling order in Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 6/01/2020. The parties shall complete and file the Consent/Nonconsent Form indicating either unanimous consent of the parties or that consent has been declined, on or before 5/25/2020. (bwilk, )
March 9, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) Kenneth T. Cuccinelli served on 3/9/2020, answer due 5/8/2020; Angela K. Goldinger served on 3/9/2020, answer due 5/8/2020; Andrew Lambrecht served on 3/9/2020, answer due 5/8/2020; Donald Neufeld served on 3/9/2020, answer due 5/8/2020; Chad F. Wolf served on 3/9/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. (Milstein, Brandt)
March 6, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, ) Modified on 3/6/2020 to DISREGARD. Filed in incorrect case. (nmarb, ).
March 4, 2020 Filing 8 CASE REASSIGNED. This case was drawn in error. This case has been randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-00587-NYW. (Text Only Entry). (sphil, )
March 4, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONES issued by Clerk. (sphil, )
March 4, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Chad F. Wolf, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Donald Neufeld, Angela K. Goldinger, Andrew Lambrecht by Plaintiff Jose Medelso Ramirez Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Milstein, Brandt)
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The summonses submitted has incorrect caption and not issued. Please file completed summonses for issuance using the event Summons Request. (trvo, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Chad F. Wolf, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Donald Neufeld, Angela K. Goldinger, Andrew Lambrecht by Plaintiff Jose Medelso Ramirez Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Milstein, Brandt)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT MANDAMUS COMPLAINT ARISING FROM DEFENDANTS' REFUSAL TO ADJUDICATE PLAINTIFFS I-485 APPLICATION TO REGISTER LEGAL PERMANENT RESIDENCE against Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Angela K. Goldinger, Andrew Lambrecht, Donald Neufeld, Chad F. Wolf (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7181364)Attorney Brandt P. Milstein added to party Jose Medelso Ramirez Gutierrez(pty:pla), filed by Jose Medelso Ramirez Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Milstein, Brandt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Lambrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Neufeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela K. Goldinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Medelso Ramirez Gutierrez
Represented By: Brandt P. Milstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?