Wallace v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al
Plaintiff: Britt Wallace
Defendant: Chattem, Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., Pfizer, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC and GlaxoSmithKline, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00623
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Filing 9 Interdistrict Transmittal of Documents via e-mail to the Southern District of Florida pursuant to the Certified Copy of the Conditional Transfer Order. CMECF_CaseTransfers@flsd.uscourts.gov. Text Only Entry (evana, )
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-8) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado, 20-cv-00623 CMA-KMT, to the Southern District of Florida, to become part of MDL 2924 by Clerk on 3/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter) (evana, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by Plaintiff Britt Wallace (Zaner, Kurt)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/19/2020 10:15 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 03/13/2020. (ksena)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Magistrate Judge Tafoya is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and should be available for trial accordingly. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/12/2020. Text Only Entry (cmalc1)
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Judge Christine M. Arguello for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-623-CMA (angar, )
March 6, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rsams, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7188384)Attorney Kurt M. Zaner added to party Britt Wallace(pty:pla), filed by Britt Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Civil Summons for GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, #3 Summons Civil Summons for Pfizer, Inc., #4 Summons Civil Summons for Chattem, Inc., #5 Summons Civil Summons for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #6 Summons Civil Summons for Sanofi US Services, Inc.)(Zaner, Kurt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glaxosmithkline LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Britt Wallace
Represented By: Kurt M. Zaner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?