Rea v. Larimer County Jail et al
Plaintiff: Michael Rea
Defendant: Larimer County Jail a/k/a L.C.D.C, Lieutenant Ramirez, Dr. Charles Davis, Armor Correctional Health Services, Sheriff Justin Smith, Sergeant M. Tutundzic, Amanda Jarman, Officer/ADA Coordinator Smith, Dr. Hanna, Larimer County Jail, L.C.D.F., Ramirez, Justin Smith, Hanna, Smith, Armor Corr. Health Services, M. Tutundzic and Charles Davis
Case Number: 1:2020cv00630
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Filing 19 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #3 Complaint by Defendants Armor Corr. Health Services, Charles Davis, Hanna, Larimer County Jail, Ramirez, Smith, Justin Smith, M. Tutundzic. (Lowe, Michael)
April 28, 2020 Filing 18 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/28/2020, re #3 Complaint filed by Michael Rea. For the reasons set forth herein, this Magistrate Judge respectfully RECOMMENDS that the Complaint (ECF No. 3) and the action be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to comply with the pleading requirements of Rule 8. (sphil, )
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF REFERENCE to the United States Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/27/2020. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, and D.C.COLO.LCivR 72.1, United States Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-00630-LTB-GPG. (sphil, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/24/2020. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1, the Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. The undersigned will remain as the assigned magistrate judge. (sphil, )
March 18, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel Adam Jacobs on behalf of Larimer County Jail, Ramirez, Smith, Justin Smith, M. TutundzicAttorney Daniel Adam Jacobs added to party Larimer County Jail(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Adam Jacobs added to party Ramirez(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Adam Jacobs added to party Smith(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Adam Jacobs added to party Justin Smith(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Adam Jacobs added to party M. Tutundzic(pty:dft) (Jacobs, Daniel)
March 12, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Error by Plaintiff Michael Rea (sphil, )
March 12, 2020 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendants Larimer County Jail, Ramirez, Smith, Justin Smith, M. Tutundzic. (Lowe, Michael)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/11/2020, re: #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond is GRANTED (sphil, )
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint. If Plaintiff fails to file an Amended Complaint that complies with this Order within the time allowed, the action may be dismissed without further notice. ORDERED that the clerk of the court mail to Mr. Rea, together with a copy of this order, a blank copy of the following form: Prisoner Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/11/2020. (forms mailed as ordered). (sphil, )
March 11, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #3 Complaint by Defendants Armor Corr. Health Services, Charles Davis, Hanna. (Montoya, Simone)
March 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Simone Marie Montoya on behalf of Armor Corr. Health Services, Charles Davis, HannaAttorney Simone Marie Montoya added to party Armor Corr. Health Services(pty:dft), Attorney Simone Marie Montoya added to party Charles Davis(pty:dft), Attorney Simone Marie Montoya added to party Hanna(pty:dft) (Montoya, Simone)
March 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel Joseph DeLay on behalf of Armor Corr. Health Services, Charles Davis, HannaAttorney Daniel Joseph DeLay added to party Armor Corr. Health Services(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Joseph DeLay added to party Charles Davis(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Joseph DeLay added to party Hanna(pty:dft) (DeLay, Daniel)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/9/2020, re: #6 Larimer County Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is GRANTED.(sphil, )
March 9, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #3 Complaint by Defendants Larimer County Jail, Ramirez, Smith, Justin Smith, M. Tutundzic. (Lowe, Michael)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 STATE COURT ORDER re: Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, signed By Larimer County Judge Stephen John Jouard on 26 February 2020. (cmadr, ) Modified to correct entry on 3/6/2020 (cmadr, ).
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Armor Corr. Health Services, Charles Davis, Hanna, Amanda Jarman, Larimer County Jail, Ramirez, Smith, Justin Smith, M. Tutundzic, filed by Michael Rea.(cmadr, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1 by Defendants Larimer County Jail a/k/a L.C.D.C, Lieutenant Ramirez, Officer/ADA Coordinator Smith, Sheriff Justin Smith, Sergeant M. Tutundzic (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lowe, Michael)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Officer/ADA Coordinator Smith, Sheriff Justin Smith, Larimer County Jail a/k/a L.C.D.C, Sergeant M. Tutundzic, Lieutenant Ramirez from Larimer County District Court, Case Number 2019cv215. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7189460), filed by Officer/ADA Coordinator Smith, Sheriff Justin Smith, Larimer County Jail a/k/a L.C.D.C, Sergeant M. Tutundzic, Lieutenant Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Lowe, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rea v. Larimer County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larimer County Jail a/k/a L.C.D.C
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Ramirez
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Charles Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armor Correctional Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Justin Smith
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant M. Tutundzic
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Jarman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer/ADA Coordinator Smith
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larimer County Jail
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Represented By: Daniel Adam Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.C.D.F.
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Represented By: Daniel Adam Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramirez
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Represented By: Daniel Adam Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Smith
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Represented By: Daniel Adam Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanna
Represented By: Daniel Joseph DeLay
Represented By: Simone Marie Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Represented By: Daniel Adam Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armor Corr. Health Services
Represented By: Daniel Joseph DeLay
Represented By: Simone Marie Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Tutundzic
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Represented By: Daniel Adam Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Davis
Represented By: Daniel Joseph DeLay
Represented By: Simone Marie Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Rea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?