Carter v. ReliaStar Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: John Carter
Defendant: ReliaStar Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00656
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29:1101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Richard N. Bien added to party ReliaStar Life Insurance Company(pty:dft) by ReliaStar Life Insurance Company.(Bien, Richard)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/16/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 6/1/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 6/8/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachent 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#3-1] is May 26, 2020. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/16/2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Carter. ReliaStar Life Insurance Company served on 3/13/2020, answer due 4/3/2020. (Bulger, Thomas)
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ReliaStar Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7195632)Attorney Thomas A. Bulger added to party John Carter(pty:pla), filed by John Carter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed summons)(Bulger, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. ReliaStar Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Carter
Represented By: Thomas A. Bulger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ReliaStar Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard N. Bien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?