Westcor Land Title Insurance Company v. Stevens
Plaintiff: Westcor Land Title Insurance Company
Defendant: Mary C Stevens
Case Number: 1:2020cv00683
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (tsher, )
April 17, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Mary C. Stevens by Plaintiff Westcor Land Title Insurance Company. (Brewer, Timothy)
March 17, 2020 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 3/17/2020. Consent Form due by 5/19/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 6/2/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, )
March 17, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-00683-NRN. (athom, )
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (rsams, )
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint,, filed by attorneyTimothy F. Brewer.Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (rsams, ).
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #1 Complaint,, filed by attorney Timothy F. Brewer.The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (rsams, )
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Westcor Land Title Insurance Company against Mary C Stevens Attorney Timothy F. Brewer added to party Westcor Land Title Insurance Company(pty:pla), filed by Westcor Land Title Insurance Company. (Receipt No. 1082-7202276; Filing fee $400.00) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Complaint, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover)(Brewer, Timothy) Modified on 3/12/2020 to add payment and receipt information (agarc, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westcor Land Title Insurance Company v. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westcor Land Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy F. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary C Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?