Suzuki v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Kimberlyn Suzuki
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00690
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 6/15/2020 11:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 6/8/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/7/2020. Text Only Entry (amont, )
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/6/2020. (ebuch)
April 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Counsel by Mary Susan Kern on behalf of Kimberlyn SuzukiAttorney Mary Susan Kern added to party Kimberlyn Suzuki(pty:pla) (Kern, Mary)
April 30, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Englert, Jack)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, up to and including 4/30/2020, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/24/2020. (ebuch)
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Englert, Jack)
March 27, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberlyn Suzuki. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. (McDermott, Shawn)
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk on 3/16/2020 (angar, )
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Life Insurance Company of North America re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Kimberlyn Suzuki. (McDermott, Shawn)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. Summonses list incorrect parties and will not be issued. Please file corrected summonses using the "Summons Request" event. (cmadr, )
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7203937)Attorney Shawn E. McDermott added to party Kimberlyn Suzuki(pty:pla), filed by Kimberlyn Suzuki. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(McDermott, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suzuki v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Jack M. Englert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberlyn Suzuki
Represented By: Shawn E. McDermott
Represented By: Mary Susan Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?