Bradburn v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Jessica Bradburn
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00746
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Englert, Jack)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/28/2020. (ksena)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Regarding Entry of Scheduling Order. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/28/2020. (ksena)
April 28, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Jessica Bradburn. (Garvey, Timothy)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED ORDER SETTING Scheduling Conference for 6/8/2020 11:30 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/22/2020. (ksena)
April 7, 2020 Filing 9 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Life Insurance Company of North America answer due 4/30/2020 per #8 Stipulation. Text Only Entry (athom, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 8 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Englert, Jack) Modified on 4/7/2020 to correct event text (athom, ).
March 27, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Bradburn. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. (Garvey, Timothy)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/19/2020 10:45 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/19/2020. (ksena)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 3/18/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc2, )
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Counsel by Shawn E. McDermott on behalf of Jessica BradburnAttorney Shawn E. McDermott added to party Jessica Bradburn(pty:pla) (McDermott, Shawn)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7211181)Attorney Timothy M. Garvey added to party Jessica Bradburn(pty:pla), filed by Jessica Bradburn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Garvey, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradburn v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Jack M. Englert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Bradburn
Represented By: Shawn E. McDermott
Represented By: Timothy M. Garvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?