Comi Investments, LLC et al v. Kiss Industries, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sleeping Squirrel Investments, LLC and Comi Investments, LLC
Defendant: Registered Agent Cole Evans, Kiss Industries, LLC and Cole Evans
Case Number: 1:2020cv00790
Filed: March 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Motion #15 referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 5/21/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
May 21, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-790-DDD (angar, )
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 18 Case Reassigned, the Scheduling Conference is VACATED. Should the matter be referred to this judicial officer, the conference will be reset and the parties may use the proposed scheduling order already on file. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/21/2020. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
May 20, 2020 Filing 18 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #16 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-00790-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
May 20, 2020 Filing 17 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Comi Investments, LLC, Sleeping Squirrel Investments, LLC. (Castro, Adrian)
May 20, 2020 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Comi Investments, LLC, Sleeping Squirrel Investments, LLC All parties do not consent.. (Castro, Adrian)
May 15, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery Proceedings During Pendency of Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Cole Evans, Kiss Industries, LLC. (Stern, Adam)
May 12, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Defendants Cole Evans, Kiss Industries, LLC. (Stern, Adam)
May 12, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Stern, Adam)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants may have up to and including May 12, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 4/21/2020. Text Only Entry(skclc1)
April 21, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #2 Complaint,, by Defendants Cole Evans, Kiss Industries, LLC. (Stern, Adam)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 5/27/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 5/20/2020. Consent Form due by 5/20/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 4/10/2020. Text Only Entry (amont, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Comi Investments, LLC, Sleeping Squirrel Investments, LLC. Cole Evans served on 4/7/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (Castro, Adrian)
April 7, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Comi Investments, LLC, Sleeping Squirrel Investments, LLC. Kiss Industries, LLC served on 4/7/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (Castro, Adrian)
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Castro, Adrian)
March 26, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, )
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 1082-7221064 (alave, )
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Cole Evans, Kiss Industries, LLC Attorney Adrian Peter Castro added to party Comi Investments, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Adrian Peter Castro added to party Sleeping Squirrel Investments, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Comi Investments, LLC, Sleeping Squirrel Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Civil Cover Sheet, #16 Summons to Cole Evans, #17 Summons to Kiss Industries, LLC)(Castro, Adrian)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 Administrative Notice: No initiating document. Attorney contacted with instructions to file the initiating document within 24 hours. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Comi Investments, LLC et al v. Kiss Industries, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sleeping Squirrel Investments, LLC
Represented By: Adrian Peter Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Comi Investments, LLC
Represented By: Adrian Peter Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Registered Agent Cole Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiss Industries, LLC
Represented By: Adam Brett Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cole Evans
Represented By: Adam Brett Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?